TAJ Properties, LLC et al v. Servis One, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: TAJ Properties, LLC and SWDC Investments, LLC
Defendant: Servis One, Inc. doing business as BSI Financial Services, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB and LH-NP-Strat Delaware Owner Trust
Case Number: 8:2022cv02313
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Referring Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2022 Filing 15 QC NOTICE: #14 Motion to Dismiss, filed by LH-NP-Strat Delaware Owner Trust was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order. To correct this problem, file Proposed Order using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Order to #14 . (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2022 Deficiency Notice for All Parties-- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statements have not been filed. The Statements must be filed by 11/15/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by LH-NP-Strat Delaware Owner Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - SWDC Investments, LLC Forfeited Corporation, #2 Exhibit 2 - SWDC Investments, LLC Forfeited Date, #3 Exhibit 3 - New LLC - SWDC Investments, LLC)(Theologou, Diana)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #7 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 10/28/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (chs, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. LH-NP-Strat Delaware Owner Trust or counsel for LH-NP-Strat Delaware Owner Trust are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 10/28/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #8 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Pursuant to the #6 Case Management Order, the parties are precluded from filing any motion without permission of the assigned judge until consent is obtained from all parties or the case is reassigned to a District Judge, if consent from all parties is not obtained. Because the time to file any preliminary motion is tolled until such time that consent is obtained from all parties or the case is reassigned to a District Judge, the Court's order denying Defendant's motion is without prejudice to the Defendant's right to renew the motion at the appropriate time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 10/13/2022. (bcs, Chambers)
October 13, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Standing by LH-NP-Strat Delaware Owner Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Theologou, Diana)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing SWDC Investments, LLC, TAJ Properties, LLC to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/28/2022 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if SWDC Investments, LLC, TAJ Properties, LLC files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 9/29/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 9/14/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. SWDC Investments, LLC, TAJ Properties, LLC or counsel for SWDC Investments, LLC, TAJ Properties, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/28/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to LH-NP-Strat Delaware Owner Trust, Servis One, Inc., Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by SWDC Investments, LLC, TAJ Properties, LLC re #1 Complaint refiling Civil Cover Sheet (Styles, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2022 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number AMDDC-10151992(Styles, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2022 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by SWDC Investments, LLC, TAJ Properties, LLC was filed incompletely. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet. The Civil Cover Sheet that was submitted was blank. Please re-file a Completed Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet to #1 . (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SWDC Investments, LLC, TAJ Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Service One, Inc., #3 Summons for WSFS, FSB, #4 Summons for LH-NP-STRAT)(Styles, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2022 The case of TAJ Properties, LLC et al v. Servis One, Inc. et al, has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is 22-cv-02313-TJS. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours. To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents. Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAJ Properties, LLC et al v. Servis One, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAJ Properties, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey W Styles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SWDC Investments, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey W Styles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servis One, Inc. doing business as BSI Financial Services
Represented By: Diana C Theologou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Diana C Theologou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LH-NP-Strat Delaware Owner Trust
Represented By: Diana C Theologou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?