FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC v. Democratic Republic of Congo et al
Plaintiff: FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC
Defendant: Democratic Republic of Congo, Societe Nationale D'Electricite, Balanne Family Living Trust, Aneth Dorah SF Mtwale, Selemani Francis Mtwale and THE LAND KNOWN FOR ASSESSMENT AND TAXATION PURPOSES AS LOT 96 PLAT 19998; LOT 133, PLAT 24987; LOT 144 PLAT 2017-25020; AND LOT 54, PLAT 24984
Case Number: 8:2022cv02369
Filed: September 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 3203 Post Judgement Remedies: Writ of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2022 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction for lack of Plaintiff standing MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimon which relief can be granted filed by Balanne Family Living Trust, Aneth Dorah SF Mtwale, Selemani Francis Mtwale, THE LAND KNOWN FOR ASSESSMENT AND TAXATION PURPOSES AS LOT 96 PLAT 19998; LOT 133, PLAT 24987; LOT 144 PLAT 2017-25020; AND LOT 54, PLAT 24984.(Lyman, Brian)
November 7, 2022 Filing 30 PAPERLESS NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTIONS HEARING and advising counsel/parties of record that the MOTIONS HEARING scheduled for December 15, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. has been RESCHEDULED to January 11, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. (Courtroom To Be Determined). Counsel should bring copies for both the Court and opposing counsel of the principal cases on which they intend to rely during oral argument. Please also highlight the appropriate text. (jmhs, Chambers)
October 28, 2022 Filing 29 PAPERLESS NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF MOTIONS HEARING and advising counsel/parties of record that oral argument on #3 Plaintiffs Motion for Writ of Attachment before Judgment and #24 Defendants Motion to Dismiss will be heard in-person before Judge Peter J. Messitte on Thursday, December 15, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. (Courtroom To Be Determined). The parties will be allotted two (2) hours for total argument. Counsel should advise in writing immediately if they expect oral argument to exceed the allotted time frame. PLEASE ALSO NOTE: Counsel should bring copies for both the Court and opposing counsel of the principal cases on which they intend to rely during oral argument. Please also highlight the appropriate text.(jmhs, Chambers)
October 25, 2022 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Other Relief Motion for Writ of Attachment Before Judgment and Request for Hearing filed by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC.(Evans, Philip)
October 25, 2022 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction for lack of Plaintiff standing MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimon which relief can be granted filed by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Evans, Philip)
October 18, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan E Pasterick on behalf of Balanne Family Living Trust, Aneth Dorah SF Mtwale, Selemani Francis Mtwale, THE LAND KNOWN FOR ASSESSMENT AND TAXATION PURPOSES AS LOT 96 PLAT 19998; LOT 133, PLAT 24987; LOT 144 PLAT 2017-25020; AND LOT 54, PLAT 24984 (Pasterick, Jonathan)
October 11, 2022 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Other Relief Motion for Writ of Attachment Before Judgment and Request for Hearing filed by Balanne Family Living Trust, Aneth Dorah SF Mtwale, Selemani Francis Mtwale, THE LAND KNOWN FOR ASSESSMENT AND TAXATION PURPOSES AS LOT 96 PLAT 19998; LOT 133, PLAT 24987; LOT 144 PLAT 2017-25020; AND LOT 54, PLAT 24984.(Lyman, Brian)
October 11, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction for lack of Plaintiff standing, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimon which relief can be granted by Balanne Family Living Trust, Aneth Dorah SF Mtwale, Selemani Francis Mtwale, THE LAND KNOWN FOR ASSESSMENT AND TAXATION PURPOSES AS LOT 96 PLAT 19998; LOT 133, PLAT 24987; LOT 144 PLAT 2017-25020; AND LOT 54, PLAT 24984(Lyman, Brian)
September 26, 2022 Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robert J Burns. Directing attorney Robert J Burns to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2022 Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Warren Gluck. Directing attorney Warren Gluck to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2022 Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Matthew DiBlasi. Directing attorney Matthew DiBlasi to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC. Selemani Francis Mtwale served on 9/20/2022, answer due 10/11/2022.(Genn, Benjamin)
September 20, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC. Aneth Dorah SF Mtwale served on 9/20/2022, answer due 10/11/2022.(Genn, Benjamin)
September 20, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC. Balanne Family Living Trust served on 9/20/2022, answer due 10/11/2022.(Genn, Benjamin)
September 20, 2022 Filing 17 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert J. Burns by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Genn, Benjamin)
September 20, 2022 Filing 16 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Warren Gluck by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Genn, Benjamin)
September 20, 2022 Filing 15 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew DiBlasi by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Genn, Benjamin)
September 20, 2022 Filing 14 QC NOTICE: #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2022 Filing 13 QC NOTICE: #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2022 Filing 12 QC NOTICE: #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 -FILED IN ERROR- Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 9/20/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/20/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
September 20, 2022 Filing 10 -FILED IN ERROR- NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC or counsel for FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 10/4/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/20/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
September 20, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued 21 days as to Balanne Family Living Trust, Democratic Republic of Congo, Aneth Dorah SF Mtwale, Selemani Francis Mtwale, Societe Nationale D'Electricite. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert J. Burns (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10160059.) by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC(Genn, Benjamin)
September 16, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Warren Gluck (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10160058.) by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC(Genn, Benjamin)
September 16, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew DiBlasi (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10160057.) by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC(Genn, Benjamin)
September 16, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Genn on behalf of FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC (Genn, Benjamin)
September 16, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Tucker Evans on behalf of FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC (Evans, Philip)
September 16, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Other Relief Motion for Writ of Attachment Before Judgment and Request for Hearing by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Grossman Redacted, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15 Unredacted, #17 Exhibit 15 Redacted, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22 Unredacted, #25 Exhibit 22 Redacted, #26 Exhibit 23 Redacted, #27 Exhibit 23 Unredacted, #28 Exhibit 24 Redacted, #29 Exhibit 24 Unredacted, #30 Exhibit 25 Redacted, #31 Exhibit 25 Unredacted, #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27, #34 Exhibit 28, #35 Exhibit 29, #36 Exhibit 30, #37 Exhibit 31, #38 Exhibit 32, #39 Exhibit 33, #40 Text of Proposed Order)(Evans, Philip)
September 16, 2022 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC identifying Other Affiliate FG Capital Management, Ltd, Other Affiliate Dike, LLC, Other Affiliate Zarathustra LLC for FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC.(Evans, Philip)
September 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Balanne Family Living Trust, Democratic Republic of Congo, Aneth Dorah SF Mtwale, Selemani Francis Mtwale, Societe Nationale D'Electricite, THE LAND KNOWN FOR ASSESSMENT AND TAXATION PURPOSES AS LOT 96 PLAT 19998; LOT 133, PLAT 24987; LOT 144 PLAT 2017-25020; AND LOT 54, PLAT 24984 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10160029.), filed by FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16 Unredacted, #18 Exhibit 16 Redacted, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23 Unredacted, #26 Exhibit 23 Redacted, #27 Exhibit 24 Redacted, #28 Exhibit 24 Unredacted, #29 Exhibit 25 Redacted, #30 Exhibit 25 Unredacted, #31 Exhibit 26 Redacted, #32 Exhibit 26 Unredacted, #33 Exhibit 27, #34 Exhibit 28, #35 Exhibit 29, #36 Exhibit 30, #37 Exhibit 31, #38 Exhibit 32, #39 Exhibit 33, #40 Exhibit 34, #41 Summons to DRC, #42 Summons to SNEL, #43 Summons to Balanne, #44 Summons to Aneth, #45 Summons Selemani)(Evans, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC v. Democratic Republic of Congo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FG Hemisphere Associates, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Genn
Represented By: Philip Tucker Evans
Represented By: Matthew DiBlasi
Represented By: Robert J Burns
Represented By: Warren Gluck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Democratic Republic of Congo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Societe Nationale D'Electricite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balanne Family Living Trust
Represented By: Jonathan E Pasterick
Represented By: Brian D Lyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aneth Dorah SF Mtwale
Represented By: Brian D Lyman
Represented By: Jonathan E Pasterick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selemani Francis Mtwale
Represented By: Jonathan E Pasterick
Represented By: Brian D Lyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LAND KNOWN FOR ASSESSMENT AND TAXATION PURPOSES AS LOT 96 PLAT 19998; LOT 133, PLAT 24987; LOT 144 PLAT 2017-25020; AND LOT 54, PLAT 24984
Represented By: Jonathan E Pasterick
Represented By: Brian D Lyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?