Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc. et al v. U.S. Department of Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc. and Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Federal Highway Administration, Maryland Department of Transportation, Maryland Transportation Authority, Pete Buttigieg, Mayela Sosa, William Pines and James F. Ports, Jr.
Case Number: 8:2022cv02482
Filed: September 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701 Judicial Review of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PAPERLESS ORDER approving notice of voluntary dismissal #37 and directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 10/14/2022. (lmys, Chambers)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc., Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc. (Prevas, Thomas)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying #9 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 10/11/2022. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 10/11/2022. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Wilhelm Lallinger on behalf of Pete Buttigieg, Mayela Sosa, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Federal Highway Administration (Lallinger, Lucas)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 EXHIBIT LIST by Maryland Department of Transportation, Maryland Transportation Authority. (rc2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Motion Hearing held on 10/11/2022 re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc. before Judge Deborah L. Boardman. (R. Carrick - Courtroom 3A)(Court Reporter: Ronda Thomas) (rc2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc., Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit)(Prevas, Thomas)
October 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Correspondence re: courtesy copies (MacWilliams, Michael)
October 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Maryland Department of Transportation, Maryland Transportation Authority, William Pines, James F. Ports, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2008 Combined Purpose and Need, #2 Exhibit B - 2009 Environmental Assessment and Draft Section 4(f), #3 Exhibit C - 2019 NEPA Re-evaluation, #4 Exhibit D - July 2019 Meeting minutes, #5 Exhibit E - Dec 2019 Presentation, #6 Exhibit F - Decl. of Brian Wolfe, #7 Exhibit G - 2020 Letter from VDOT, #8 Exhibit H - 2021 Letter from VDOT)(MacWilliams, Michael)
October 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Pete Buttigieg, Mayela Sosa, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Federal Highway Administration. (Attachments: #1 Vice Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Vice, Samuel)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel R. Vice on behalf of Pete Buttigieg, Mayela Sosa, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Federal Highway Administration (Vice, Samuel)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Supplement to #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc., Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc. Affidavit of David Brickley (Prevas, Thomas)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Telephone Status Conference held on 10/6/2022 before Judge Deborah L. Boardman.(FTR - Ulander - 2C.) (bus, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Catherine Rinehart on behalf of Maryland Department of Transportation, Maryland Transportation Authority, William Pines, James F. Ports, Jr. (Rinehart, Elizabeth)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B MacWilliams on behalf of Maryland Department of Transportation, Maryland Transportation Authority, William Pines, James F. Ports, Jr. (MacWilliams, Michael)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Roann Nichols on behalf of Mayela Sosa, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Federal Highway Administration (Nichols, Roann)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc.. (Roy, Anamika)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Roann Nichols on behalf of Pete Buttigieg (Nichols, Roann)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc.. (Roy, Anamika)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc.. James F. Ports, Jr. served on 10/3/2022, answer due 10/24/2022.(Roy, Anamika)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc.. Maryland Department of Transportation served on 10/3/2022, answer due 10/24/2022.(Roy, Anamika)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc.. William Pines served on 10/3/2022, answer due 10/24/2022.(Roy, Anamika)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc.. Maryland Transportation Authority served on 10/3/2022, answer due 10/24/2022.(Roy, Anamika)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc.. Mayela Sosa served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022.(Roy, Anamika)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc.. U.S. Federal Highway Administration served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022.(Roy, Anamika)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc.. U.S. Department of Transportation served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022.(Roy, Anamika)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc.. Pete Buttigieg served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022.(Roy, Anamika)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER Scheduling An on-the-record call for Thursday, October6, 2022 at 2 p.m.. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 10/3/2022. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc., Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Affidavit of Eric Brenner, #8 Certificate Of Attorney Anamika R. Moore Relating To Service Pursuant To Rule 65, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Roy, Anamika)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 9/29/2022. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued 60 days as to Pete Buttigieg, Maryland Department of Transportation, Maryland Transportation Authority, William Pines, James F. Ports, Jr., Mayela Sosa, U.S. Department of Transportation, and U.S. Federal Highway Administration(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anamika Roy, Roy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Roy, Anamika)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Deborah L. Boardman. (kos, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc., Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Prevas, Thomas)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc. (Prevas, Thomas)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc. (Prevas, Thomas)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc. (Prevas, Thomas)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10180781.), filed by Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc., Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Prevas, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc. et al v. U.S. Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Potomac Heritage Trail Association, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas K Prevas
Represented By: Anamika Roy, Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dahlgren Railroad Heritage Trail Association, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas K Prevas
Represented By: Anamika Roy, Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oxon Hill Bicycle and Trail Club, Inc.
Represented By: Anamika Roy, Roy
Represented By: Thomas K Prevas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Transportation
Represented By: Samuel R. Vice
Represented By: Lucas Wilhelm Lallinger
Represented By: Roann Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Federal Highway Administration
Represented By: Samuel R. Vice
Represented By: Lucas Wilhelm Lallinger
Represented By: Roann Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Department of Transportation
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Rinehart
Represented By: Michael B MacWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Transportation Authority
Represented By: Michael B MacWilliams
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Buttigieg
Represented By: Roann Nichols
Represented By: Lucas Wilhelm Lallinger
Represented By: Samuel R. Vice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayela Sosa
Represented By: Samuel R. Vice
Represented By: Lucas Wilhelm Lallinger
Represented By: Roann Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pines
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Rinehart
Represented By: Michael B MacWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Ports, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Rinehart
Represented By: Michael B MacWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?