GCE Gas Control Equipment Inc. v. 3B Medical Manufacturing, LLC
Counter Defendant: GCE Gas Control Equipment Inc.
Counter Claimant: 3B Medical Manufacturing, LLC
Case Number: 8:2022cv02550
Filed: October 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 dj Fed. Question: Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/12/2022. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi for Mediation. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/8/2022. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by GCE Gas Control Equipment Inc..(Masters, Robert)
December 7, 2022 Filing 23 Case Management Conference held on 12/7/2022 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(Court Reporter: FTR Recording\2B) (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2022 Filing 22 PAPERLESS NOTICE. A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE is scheduled for December 7, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 12071100 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties should also be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance of the Case Management Conference and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 23, 2022 Filing 21 Joint Request for Conference (Masters, Robert)
November 22, 2022 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Timothy Murphy. Directing attorney Timothy Murphy to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 11/22/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2022 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David L. Atallah. Directing attorney David L. Atallah to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 11/22/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2022 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Roy Jung. Directing attorney Roy Jung to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 11/22/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2022 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Eric K. Gill. Directing attorney Eric K. Gill to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 11/22/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2022 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Timothy P. Cremen. Directing attorney Timothy P. Cremen to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 11/22/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy J. Murphy (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10281960.) by 3B Medical Manufacturing, LLC(Simms, J)
November 21, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David L. Atallah (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10281937.) by 3B Medical Manufacturing, LLC(Simms, J)
November 21, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Roy Jung (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10281504.) by GCE Gas Control Equipment Inc.(Masters, Robert)
November 21, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric K. Gill (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10281492.) by GCE Gas Control Equipment Inc.(Masters, Robert)
November 21, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy P. Cremen (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10281348.) by GCE Gas Control Equipment Inc.(Masters, Robert)
November 16, 2022 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by 3B Medical Manufacturing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent React Health Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate 3B Medical, Inc., Other Affiliate Ventec Life Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Watermark Medical, Inc., Other Affiliate Medicomp, Inc., Other Affiliate Medi-Lynx Cardiac Monitoring, LLC for 3B Medical Manufacturing, LLC.(Simms, J)
November 16, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against GCE Gas Control Equipment Inc. by 3B Medical Manufacturing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Simms, J)
November 7, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GCE Gas Control Equipment Inc.. 3B Medical Manufacturing, LLC served on 10/27/2022, answer due 11/17/2022.(Masters, Robert)
October 14, 2022 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by GCE Gas Control Equipment Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Enovis Corp., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Investment Management, Inc. for GCE Gas Control Equipment Inc..(Masters, Robert)
October 13, 2022 Filing 6 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Masters, Robert)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/6/2022. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to GCE Gas Control Equipment Inc..(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2022 Filing 3 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 10/13/2022 (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2022 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by GCE Gas Control Equipment Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corp. for GCE Gas Control Equipment Inc..(Masters, Robert)
October 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3B Medical Manufacturing, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10193539.), filed by GCE Gas Control Equipment Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Masters, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GCE Gas Control Equipment Inc. v. 3B Medical Manufacturing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: GCE Gas Control Equipment Inc.
Represented By: Robert M Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: 3B Medical Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: J Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?