Lewis v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Kiesha D Lewis
Defendant: United States of America, Hiroyoshi Korosue and Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Case Number: 8:2022cv02566
Filed: October 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dafney Dubuisson Stokes. Directing attorney Dafney Dubuisson Stokes to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 11/22/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dafney Dubuisson Stokes (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10277471.) by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for SDNY)(Haney, James)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #7 unopposed motion for extension of time. The government may have to and including December 12, 2022, to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/9/2022. (sat, Chambers)
October 26, 2022 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dafney Dubuisson Stokes. Directing attorney Dafney Dubuisson Stokes to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 10/26/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna A. Miller on behalf of United States of America (Miller, Anna)
October 20, 2022 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by United States of America (Thomas, Beatrice) Modified on 10/21/2022 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
October 20, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #4 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions filed by United States of America.(Thomas, Beatrice)
October 17, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Additional Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Thomas, Beatrice)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to reset the link to [ECF Nos. 1-4 and 2] so that non-court users may not access it and DIRECTING Defendants' counsel to re-file the document in accordance with this court's Privacy Policy published in the Electronic Filing Requirements and Procedures Manual, Part IV. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 10/14/2022. (Chasanow, Deborah)
October 13, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dafney Dubuisson Stokes (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10207511.) by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation(Haney, James)
October 13, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Complaint by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Beatrice)
October 13, 2022 Filing 6 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Kiesha D Lewis. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2022 Filing 5 Removal Notification Letter mailed to Kiesha D Lewis.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 10.12.2022)
October 12, 2022 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 10.12.2022)
October 12, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Judge Richard D. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Intention to Defend by Hiroyoshi Korosue (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2022 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2 and 3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE DISTRICT COURT OF MARYLAND FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Hiroyoshi Korosue, United States of America, filed by Kiesha D Lewis.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2022: #1 Attachment) (kb3s, Deputy Clerk).
October 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court for Prince George's County, case number 050200124542022., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, #3 Exhibit State Court Notice of Intention to Defend, #4 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit State Court Complaint Exhibit)(Thomas, Beatrice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiesha D Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Beatrice C. Thomas
Represented By: Anna A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiroyoshi Korosue
Represented By: James K Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Represented By: James K Haney
Represented By: Dafney Dubuisson Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?