Maryland Chapter of the Sierra Club et al v. Federal Highway Adminstration et al
Plaintiff: Maryland Chapter of the Sierra Club, Friends of Moses Hall, National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States and Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Defendant: Federal Highway Adminstration, Stephanie Pollack, Gregory Murrill, Maryland Department of Transportation and James F. Ports, Jr.
Case Number: 8:2022cv02597
Filed: October 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4332 Environmental Policy - Cooperation of Agencies; Reports
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of Moses Hall, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Maryland Chapter of the Sierra Club, National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States. James F. Ports, Jr. served on 10/13/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Ports proof of service)(DeMarco, Peter)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of Moses Hall, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Maryland Chapter of the Sierra Club, National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States. Maryland Department of Transportation served on 10/13/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment MDOT proof of service, #2 Attachment MD Attorney General proof of service, #3 Attachment MD Attorney General email service)(DeMarco, Peter)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of Moses Hall, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Maryland Chapter of the Sierra Club, National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States. Gregory Murrill served on 10/13/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Murrill proof of service)(DeMarco, Peter)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of Moses Hall, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Maryland Chapter of the Sierra Club, National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States. Stephanie Pollack served on 10/13/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Pollack proof of service)(DeMarco, Peter)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of Moses Hall, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Maryland Chapter of the Sierra Club, National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States. Federal Highway Adminstration served on 10/13/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment FHWA proof of servic, #2 Attachment US Attorney General proof of servicw, #3 Attachment US Attorney's Office proof of service)(DeMarco, Peter)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #21 unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendants Maryland Department of Transportation and James F. Ports, Jr. may have to and including December 19, 2022, to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/15/2022. (Chasanow, Deborah)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, (Unopposed) by Maryland Department of Transportation, James F. Ports, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rinehart, Elizabeth)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Catherine Rinehart on behalf of Maryland Department of Transportation, James F. Ports, Jr. (Rinehart, Elizabeth)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Fred Roy Wagner on behalf of Maryland Department of Transportation, James F. Ports, Jr. (Wagner, Fred)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Roann Nichols on behalf of Federal Highway Adminstration, Gregory Murrill, Stephanie Pollack (Nichols, Roann)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda M. DeVuono on behalf of Maryland Department of Transportation (DeVuono, Linda)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel R. Vice on behalf of Federal Highway Adminstration, Gregory Murrill, Stephanie Pollack (Vice, Samuel)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Elizabeth S. Merritt. Directing attorney Elizabeth S. Merritt to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 10/26/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Andrea Carol Ferster. Directing attorney Andrea Carol Ferster to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 10/26/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nanding Chen. Directing attorney Nanding Chen to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 10/26/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Atid Kimelman. Directing attorney Atid Kimelman to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 10/26/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued 21 days as to Maryland Department of Transportation, James F. Ports, Jr. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued 60 days as to Federal Highway Adminstration, Gregory Murrill, Stephanie Pollack, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth S. Merritt (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10202174.) by Friends of Moses Hall, Maryland Chapter of the Sierra Club, National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.(DeMarco, Peter)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrea Ferster (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10202147.) by Friends of Moses Hall, Maryland Chapter of the Sierra Club, National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.(DeMarco, Peter)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nanding Chen (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10202131.) by Friends of Moses Hall, Maryland Chapter of the Sierra Club, National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.(DeMarco, Peter)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Atid Kimelman (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10202113.) by Friends of Moses Hall, Maryland Chapter of the Sierra Club, National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.(DeMarco, Peter)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States identifying Other Affiliate National Trust Historic Real Estate Debt Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate National Main Street Center, Inc., Other Affiliate National Trust Community Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate Greenrock Corporation, Other Affiliate Cooper-Molera Preservation LLC for National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States.(DeMarco, Peter)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. (DeMarco, Peter)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Friends of Moses Hall (DeMarco, Peter)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Maryland Chapter of the Sierra Club (DeMarco, Peter)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10201586.), filed by Friends of Moses Hall, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Maryland Chapter of the Sierra Club, National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons FHWA Summons, #3 Summons S Pollack Summons, #4 Summons G Murrill Summons, #5 Summons US Attorney General Summons, #6 Summons US Attorney's Office for D.Md, #7 Summons MDOT Summons, #8 Summons J Ports Jr Summons, #9 Summons MD Assistant Attorney General Summons)(DeMarco, Peter)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (kos, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maryland Chapter of the Sierra Club et al v. Federal Highway Adminstration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryland Chapter of the Sierra Club
Represented By: Peter James DeMarco
Represented By: Atid Kimelman
Represented By: Nanding Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Moses Hall
Represented By: Peter James DeMarco
Represented By: Atid Kimelman
Represented By: Nanding Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States
Represented By: Peter James DeMarco
Represented By: Andrea Carol Ferster
Represented By: Atid Kimelman
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Merritt
Represented By: Nanding Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By: Peter James DeMarco
Represented By: Nanding Chen
Represented By: Atid Kimelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Highway Adminstration
Represented By: Samuel R. Vice
Represented By: Roann Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Pollack
Represented By: Roann Nichols
Represented By: Samuel R. Vice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Murrill
Represented By: Samuel R. Vice
Represented By: Roann Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Department of Transportation
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Rinehart
Represented By: Fred Roy Wagner
Represented By: Linda M. DeVuono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Ports, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Rinehart
Represented By: Fred Roy Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?