Youngs Transport, LLC v. Volvo Group North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Youngs Transport, LLC
Defendant: Volvo Group North America, LLC, Volvo Trucks North America, Volvo Group North America, Inc. and Volvo Group North America LLC
Case Number: 8:2022cv02753
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Referring Judge: Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Removal - Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for Friday, March 24, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/9/2022. (jmm, Chambers)
December 2, 2022 Filing 21 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Carback, Joshua)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER on Resolution of Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 11/30/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: Referral for All further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 11/30/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing the parties to submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #17 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/29/2022. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi and Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for Settlement. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/29/2022. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER cancelling tomorrow's Rule 16 conference in light of the parties' consent to proceed before a magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/28/2022. (lmys, Chambers)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/30/2023. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/28/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2022 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Volvo Group North America LLC(Carback, Joshua)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re: Informal Discovery Dispute Procedure. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/15/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Call. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2022 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.5 Certificate(Carback, Joshua)
October 27, 2022 Filing 10 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 27, 2022 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-9) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR CALVERT COUNTY. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Volvo Group North America LLC (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Second Amended Complaint by Volvo Group North America LLC. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2022 Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Volvo Group North America LLC, filed by Youngs Transport, LLC. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2022 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Volvo Group North America, Inc., filed by Youngs Transport, LLC. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued 60 days as to Volvo Trucks North America. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Volvo Trucks North America, filed by Youngs Transport, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report, #2 Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Volvo Group North America, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,,, (Carback, Joshua)
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Volvo Group North America, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Mack Trucks, Inc. for Volvo Group North America, LLC.(Carback, Joshua)
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from C-04-CV-22-000314, case number Circuit Court for Calvert County. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10232794), filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Cert. of Filing, #3 Exhibit A - Youngs Transport, LLC's [Original] Complaint and Statement of Facts, #4 Exhibit B - Parties' Agreement (September 20, 2022), #5 Exhibit C - Youngs Transport, LLC's [First] Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit D - Youngs Transport, LLC's [Second] Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit E - Answer to Complaint, #8 Exhibit F - Youngs Transport, LLC's Articles of Organization (January 6, 2021), #9 Exhibit G - Affidavit in Support of Removal (executed), #10 Exhibit H - State Court Notice of Removal)(Carback, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Youngs Transport, LLC v. Volvo Group North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Youngs Transport, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Herritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Group North America, LLC
Represented By: Andrew T Stephenson
Represented By: Joshua T Carback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Trucks North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Group North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Group North America LLC
Represented By: Joshua T Carback
Represented By: Andrew T Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?