Desktop Alert Inc. v. Alertus Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: Desktop Alert, LLC and Desktop Alert Inc.
Defendant: Alertus Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 8:2022cv03337
Filed: December 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L Boardman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Consented to Plaintiff Defendant's response to the complaint is due June 1, 2023. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 4/14/2023. (lmys, Chambers)
April 14, 2023 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Consented to Plaintiff by Desktop Alert Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aitken, Andrew)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Alertus Technologies, LLC's response to the complaint is due 4/17/2023. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 2/10/2023. (lmys, Chambers)
February 10, 2023 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Desktop Alert Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Metis Secure Solutions for Desktop Alert Inc..(Aitken, Andrew)
February 9, 2023 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Desktop Alert Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aitken, Andrew)
January 25, 2023 Filing 17 SECOND QC NOTICE: #15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Desktop Alert Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Corporate parents an/or affiliates must be added when the disclosure is filed. Please refile and add the party when prompted by the system. If needed, contact the Clerk's office with questions, prior to refiling. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2023 Filing 16 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Aitken, Andrew)
January 24, 2023 Filing 15 [FILED IN ERROR] Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Desktop Alert, LLC (Aitken, Andrew) Modified on 1/25/2023 (kk5s, Deputy Clerk).
January 20, 2023 Filing 14 QC NOTICE: #11 Notice (Other) filed by Desktop Alert, LLC, #9 Notice (Other) filed by Desktop Alert, LLC was filed incorrectly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. Wrong Event Selected. Please refiled using the event Report on Filing Patent/Trademark so the patent office is notified. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2023 Filing 13 QC NOTICE: #10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Desktop Alert, LLC was filed incorrectly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. **When docketing the Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement the Corporate Parents, Affiliates and parties with a financial interest MUST be entered when prompted by CM/ECF to do so. Please re-file the document correctly. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 motion to seal Exhibit C to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 1/5/2023. (lmys, Chambers)
January 4, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE by Desktop Alert, LLC of Patent Filing for US Patent and Trademark Office (Aitken, Andrew)
January 4, 2023 Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Desktop Alert, LLC (Aitken, Andrew) Modified on 1/5/2023 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
January 4, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE by Desktop Alert, LLC of Patent Filing to US Patent and Trademark Officep (Aitken, Andrew)
January 3, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued 21 days as to Alertus Technologies, LLC.(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
December 30, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by Desktop Alert, LLC Proposed Summons (Aitken, Andrew)
December 30, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by Desktop Alert, LLC Civil Cover Sheet (Aitken, Andrew)
December 30, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Protective Order to Seal Exhibit C to Complaint by Desktop Alert, LLC(Aitken, Andrew)
December 30, 2022 Filing 4 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit C to Complaint by Desktop Alert, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Aitken, Andrew)
December 28, 2022 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Desktop Alert, LLC was filed incorrectly. **A Motion to Seal is required for filing an exhibit under seal. Please file the Motion to seal and then separately, file the Proposed Sealed Exhibit using the event "Notice of Filing Exhibit or Attachment Under Seal." Please contact the Clerks Office, if needed, prior to filing. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2022 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Desktop Alert, LLC was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summonses for issuance. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summonses for issuance using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summonses for issuance to #1 Complaint. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2022 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 1/4/2023 (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2022 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 1/4/2023 (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alertus Technologies, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10341535.), filed by Desktop Alert, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US Patent No. 9,172,765, #2 Exhibit Alertus Tech. Marketing Doc., #3 Exhibit Robertson Transcript, filed under seal, #4 Exhibit Alertus Tech.Marketing Doc., #5 Exhibit Desktop Alert press releases)(Aitken, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desktop Alert Inc. v. Alertus Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desktop Alert, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Charles Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desktop Alert Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Charles Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alertus Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?