Thompson v. L'Oreal USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Thompson
Defendant: LORAL USA, INC.,, LORAL USA PRODUCTS, INC, SOFT SHEEN-CARSON, LLC, CARSON, INC., D/B/A SOFT SHEEN, CARSON (W.I.), INC., D/B/A SOFT SHEEN, L'Oreal USA, Inc., L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., Soft Sheen/Carson, Inc. and Soft Sheen/Caron (W.I.), Inc.
Case Number: 8:2022cv03365
Filed: December 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2672 Federal Tort Claims Act - Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 Filing 23 Case Transferred to USDC for Northern Illinois, Eastern Division via CM/ECF case extraction. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2023 Filing 22 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER transferring case to the USDC for Northern Illinois. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 2/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2023 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Thompson. Soft Sheen-Carson, LLC served on 1/3/2023.(Triantis, George)
January 19, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Thompson. L'Oreal USA, Inc. served on 1/3/2023.(Triantis, George)
January 19, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Thompson. L'Oreal USA Products, Inc. served on 1/3/2023, answer due 1/24/2023.(Triantis, George)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #7 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 1/19/2023. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2023 Filing 17 QC NOTICE: #9 , #10 and #11 Affidavits of Service, filed by Elizabeth Thompson were filed incorrectly. **Please re-file using the event "Summons Returned Executed" and follow prompts to set answer deadline. They have been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document links have been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Consent/Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff must correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent/declination forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge OR 25 Pct Mag Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, both located in Other Filings >Other Documents. **Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge OR 25 Pct Mag Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, both located in Other Filings >Other Documents. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2023 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Rene F. Rocha. Directing attorney Rene F. Rocha to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 1/19/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Paula Xinis. Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rene F. Rocha (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10380644.) by Elizabeth Thompson(Triantis, George)
January 17, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Thompson. Soft Sheen/Caron (W.I.), Inc. served on 1/3/2023, answer due 1/24/2023.(Triantis, George)
January 17, 2023 Filing 11 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, and Summons served on Legal Representative of CSC, Designated Agent on 1/3/2023, filed by Elizabeth Thompson.(Triantis, George) Modified on 1/19/2023 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
January 17, 2023 Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, and Summons served on Legal Representative of CSC, Designated Agent on 1/3/2023, filed by Elizabeth Thompson.(Triantis, George) Modified on 1/19/2023 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
January 17, 2023 Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, and Summons served on Legal Representative of CSC, Designated Agent on 1/3/2023, filed by Elizabeth Thompson.(Triantis, George) Modified on 1/19/2023 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 (MAG25 NOTICE FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE (Triantis, George) Modified on 1/19/2023 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing Plaintiff Elizabeth Thompson to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/24/2023 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Plaintiff Elizabeth Thompson files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 1/17/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 1/14/2023. (Quereshi, Ajmel)
January 13, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Soft Sheen-Carson, LLC, Soft Sheen/Caron (W.I.), Inc.(Barnes, Jonathan)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 12/30/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 30, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel A. Quereshi. Elizabeth Thompson or counsel for Elizabeth Thompson are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/13/2023. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Soft Sheen-Carson, LLC, Soft Sheen/Caron (W.I.), Inc., Soft Sheen/Carson, Inc..(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 30, 2022 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi. (kos, Deputy Clerk)
December 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10347170.), filed by Elizabeth Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Triantis, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. L'Oreal USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Thompson
Represented By: George Triantis
Represented By: Rene F. Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORAL USA, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORAL USA PRODUCTS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOFT SHEEN-CARSON, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Anthony Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARSON, INC., D/B/A SOFT SHEEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARSON (W.I.), INC., D/B/A SOFT SHEEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Anthony Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Products, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Anthony Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soft Sheen/Carson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soft Sheen/Caron (W.I.), Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Anthony Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?