Murphy v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maria Murphy
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Bayer Pharma AG
Case Number: 8:2023cv00122
Filed: January 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L Boardman
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss , Or In The Alternative, MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Bayer Pharma AG (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - To Memorandum, #3 Exhibit B - To Memorandum, #4 Exhibit C - To Memorandum, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Mims, Buffy)
February 23, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Murphy. All Parties.(Haddad, P.)
February 23, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Murphy. All Parties.(Haddad, P.)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' response to the complaint is due April 4, 2023. If defendants file a dispositive motion in response to the complaint, plaintiff's response is due within 45 days of the motion. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 2/21/2023. (lmys, Chambers)
February 17, 2023 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG, Corporate Parent Schering Berlin Inc, Other Affiliate Bayer Corporation, Other Affiliate Bayer Pharma AG, Other Affiliate Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH, Other Affiliate Bayer US Holding LP, Other Affiliate Bayer World Investments B.V., Other Affiliate Bayer HealthCare Holdings LLC., Other Affiliate Bayer Solution B.V, Other Affiliate Bayer CropScience AG for Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Mims, Buffy)
February 17, 2023 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Reply to Complaint by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Mims, Buffy)
February 17, 2023 Deficiency Notice for Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 2/24/2023 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Buffy J Mims on behalf of Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Mims, Buffy)
February 16, 2023 Filing 13 QC NOTICE: #12 Acknowledgment of Service filed by Maria Murphy, #11 Acknowledgment of Service filed by Maria Murphy was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Please refile using Service of Process > Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2023 Filing 12 -FILED IN ERROR- ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Maria Murphy.(Haddad, P.) Modified on 2/16/2023 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
February 16, 2023 Filing 11 -FILED IN ERROR- ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Maria Murphy.(Haddad, P.) Modified on 2/16/2023 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
January 31, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2023 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of P. Gregory Haddad. Directing attorney P. Gregory Haddad to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 1/18/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2023 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of D. Todd Matthews. Directing attorney D. Todd Matthews to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 1/18/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 1/18/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Maria Murphy or counsel for Maria Murphy are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 2/1/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for P. Gregory Haddad (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10379178.) by Maria Murphy(Brennan, William)
January 18, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for D. Todd Matthews (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10379156.) by Maria Murphy(Brennan, William)
January 18, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William C Brennan, Jr on behalf of Maria Murphy (Brennan, William)
January 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Filed by Plaintiff Maria Murphy against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10378900.), filed by Maria Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Brennan, William)
January 18, 2023 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms. (kos, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Murphy
Represented By: William C Brennan, Jr
Represented By: D. Todd Matthews
Represented By: P. Gregory Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Buffy J Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharma AG
Represented By: Buffy J Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?