Straubmuller v. Jetblue Airways Corporation
Plaintiff: MATTHEW STRAUBMULLER
Defendant: JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION
Case Number: 8:2023cv00384
Filed: February 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Referring Judge: Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #11 motion to dismiss and DISMISSING the complaint. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/1/2023. (sat, Chambers)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/1/2023. (sat, Chambers)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE by Matthew Straubmuller re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Supplemental Authority)(Nathan, Steven)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Jetblue Airways Corporation re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint - Of Supplemental Authority in Support of JetBlue Airways Corporation's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Esposito, Tonya)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Jetblue Airways Corporation.(Guyon, Rebekah)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE re #12 Notice (Other), Reply in Support of Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice filed by Jetblue Airways Corporation.(Guyon, Rebekah)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #16 unopposed motion to enlarge page limit to 25 pages for Defendant's reply. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 5/15/2023. (sat, Chambers)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - Unopposed - Limits for Defendant's Reply by Jetblue Airways Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guyon, Rebekah)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE re #12 Notice (Other), OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATIONS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Matthew Straubmuller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pizzirusso, James)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Matthew Straubmuller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pizzirusso, James)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jetblue Airways Corporation (Esposito, Tonya)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Deficiency Notice -Jetblue Airways Corporation- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 4/25/2023 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE by Jetblue Airways Corporation re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint - Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss - (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1-18, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Esposito, Tonya)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Jetblue Airways Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Esposito, Tonya)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Jagher on behalf of Matthew Straubmuller (Jagher, Jonathan)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jacob D. Bundick. Directing attorney Jacob D. Bundick to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/2/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Rebekah S. Guyon. Directing attorney Rebekah S. Guyon to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/2/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jacob D. Bundick (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10461969.) by Jetblue Airways Corporation(Esposito, Tonya)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rebekah S. Guyon (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10461873.) by Jetblue Airways Corporation(Esposito, Tonya)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matthew Straubmuller. Jetblue Airways Corporation waiver sent on 2/16/2023, answer due 4/17/2023.(Nathan, Steven)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Steven Mark Nathan. Directing attorney Steven Mark Nathan to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 2/14/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven M. Nathan (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10430195.) by Matthew Straubmuller(Pizzirusso, James)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Jetblue Airways Corporation.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10427152.), filed by MATTHEW STRAUBMULLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Pizzirusso, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Straubmuller v. Jetblue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW STRAUBMULLER
Represented By: James J Pizzirusso
Represented By: Steven Mark Nathan
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION
Represented By: Tonya Esposito
Represented By: Rebekah S. Guyon
Represented By: Jacob D. Bundick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?