Streit v. Private Identity, LLC
Plaintiff: Brian Streit, Ph.D.
Defendant: Private Identity, LLC and Inference Holdings LLC
Case Number: 8:2023cv02031
Filed: July 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 256 Patent Non-Infringement (Correction of Named Inventor)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/21/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Private Identity, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albert, Michael)
September 8, 2023 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael A Albert. Directing attorney Michael A Albert to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 9/8/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 8, 2023 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John W. McGrath. Directing attorney John W. McGrath to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 9/8/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 8, 2023 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Eric J. Rutt. Directing attorney Eric J. Rutt to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 9/8/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael A. Albert (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10805498.) by Private Identity, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Etelson, Glenn)
September 7, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John W. McGrath (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10805488.) by Private Identity, LLC(Etelson, Glenn)
September 7, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric J. Rutt (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10805466.) by Private Identity, LLC(Etelson, Glenn)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Private Identity, LLC, answer due 9/20/2023. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/18/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Private Identity, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etelson, Glenn)
August 17, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Curtis Etelson on behalf of Private Identity, LLC (Etelson, Glenn)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/4/2023. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2023 Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robert M. Isackson. Directing attorney Robert M. Isackson to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 7/28/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Private Identity, LLC.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert M. Isackson (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10733740.) by Brian Streit (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment Setting Forth Dates and Court of Admission)(Greivell, Adam)
July 27, 2023 Filing 3 Correspondence re: Summons to be filed with Complaint (Greivell, Adam)
July 27, 2023 Filing 2 Correspondence re: Filing of Exhibits to be Attached to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - US10419221, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - US10721070, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - US10938852, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - US11122078, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - US11138333, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - US11170084, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - US11210375, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - US11265168, #9 Exhibit Ex. I - US11362831, #10 Exhibit Ex. J - US11392802, #11 Exhibit Ex. K - US11394552, #12 Exhibit Ex. L - US11489866, #13 Exhibit Ex. M - US11502841, #14 Exhibit Ex. N - US11640452, #15 Exhibit Ex. O - US11677559, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greivell, Adam)
July 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Private Identity, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10733046.), filed by Brian Streit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greivell, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streit v. Private Identity, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Private Identity, LLC
Represented By: Glenn Curtis Etelson
Represented By: Eric J. Rutt
Represented By: John W. McGrath
Represented By: Michael A Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inference Holdings LLC
Represented By: John W. McGrath
Represented By: Michael A Albert
Represented By: Glenn Curtis Etelson
Represented By: Eric J. Rutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Streit, Ph.D.
Represented By: Adam D Greivell
Represented By: Robert M. Isackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?