State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Viking Corporation et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Viking Corporation and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 8:2023cv02060
Filed: July 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimVIKINGS MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Viking Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1 - Final Order, #5 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #6 Exhibit 3 - Settlement Agreement, #7 Exhibit 4 - Preliminary Approval Order, #8 Exhibit 5 - Amended Preliminary Approval Order, #9 Exhibit 6 - Opt-Out List, #10 Exhibit 7 - 10.25.22 Donan Lab Report, #11 Exhibit 8 - Special Warranty Deed, #12 Exhibit 9 - Maricopa Assessor's Search, #13 Exhibit 10 - Clayton v. Equifax Order Granting MTD, #14 Exhibit 11 - Schmidt v. Equifax Order)(Lankford, Taylor)
August 11, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor T Lankford on behalf of Viking Corporation (Lankford, Taylor)
August 1, 2023 Filing 17 Removal Notification Letter sent to Attorney for Defendant. (c/m 8/1/2023 bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2023 Filing 16 Removal Notification Letter sent to Attorney for Plaintiff. (c/m 8/1/2023 bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2023 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:23-cv-00967. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Change Venue. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. The stay of the case is lifted. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 7/31/23. (MAP)
July 25, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE re: Notice of Non-Opposition to its Motion to Transfer Venue to the District of Maryland by Viking Corporation re: #8 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to District of Maryland . (Wiberg, Ashley)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED the motion to stay (Doc. #10 ) is granted. All proceedings in this action are hereby stayed until the Court rules on Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the District of Maryland. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 7/11/2023. (SLQ)
July 6, 2023 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the District of Maryland #10 MOTION to Stay re: #9 Memorandum, #8 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to District of Maryland by Defendant Viking Corporation. (Wiberg, Ashley)
July 6, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay re: #9 Memorandum, #8 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to District of Maryland by Viking Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wiberg, Ashley)
July 6, 2023 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the District of Maryland #8 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to District of Maryland by Defendant Viking Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Wiberg, Ashley)
July 6, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to District of Maryland by Viking Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wiberg, Ashley)
June 13, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Moulton, Timothy)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting the parties' #5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Viking Corporation's answer deadline is extended to 7/7/2023. Ordered by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 6/8/23. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB)
June 7, 2023 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Motion to Extend Defendant's Response Deadline by Viking Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wiberg, Ashley)
May 31, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (ARC)
May 31, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21960711. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-967-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
May 31, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viking Corporation. (Wiberg, Ashley) (ARC)
May 31, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2023-006243. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21960711 filed by Viking Corporation. (Wiberg, Ashley) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(ARC)
May 31, 2023 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Demand for Jury Trial upon Viking Corporation on 5/1/2023. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 5/10/2023) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Viking Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Corporation
Represented By: Taylor T Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?