Reeves v. University of Maryland Capitol Region Health
Plaintiff: Stella Reeves
Defendant: University of Maryland Capitol Region Health
Case Number: 8:2023cv02169
Filed: August 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk to edit #5 to an Amended Complaint; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/26/2023. (c/m & e/m as directed 9/26/2023 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Stella Reeves.(ybs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/26/2023 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, response due by 9/20/2023 (c/m to Plaintiff 8/30/23 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/30/2023. (sat, Chambers)
August 11, 2023 Filing 3 New Case Notification Letter sent to Stella Reeves. (c/m 8/11/2023 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stella Reeves(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against University of Maryland Capitol Region Health, filed by Stella Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeves v. University of Maryland Capitol Region Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Maryland Capitol Region Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?