McClain et al v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Theodora A McClain and Theodore R McClain
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Actavis LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sandoz Inc., Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira, Inc., Sun Pharma Global FZE, Pfizer Inc, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Actavis Inc., Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories Ltd., McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging and Winthrop U.S. doing business as Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Case Number: 8:2023cv03061
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #19 Joint Notice of Pending Settlement and Request to Stay Proceedings. A Status Report is due by May 24, 2024. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/29/2023. (vals, Chambers)
November 29, 2023 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher S. McRae. Directing attorney Christopher S. McRae to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 11/29/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC - Notice of Pending Settlement and Request To Stay Proceedings (Dew, Ellen)
November 21, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher S. McRae (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10942103.) by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC(Dew, Ellen)
November 21, 2023 Filing 17 Correspondence re: Ten Remanded Cases Be Designated As Related (Dew, Ellen)
November 15, 2023 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi, Other Affiliate Sanofi US Services Inc. for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC; Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc..(Dew, Ellen)
November 15, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Elizabeth Dew on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Dew, Ellen)
November 15, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Pauline Ain on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Ain, Alexa)
November 15, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P O Day on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (O Day, Michael)
November 9, 2023 Filing 12 Transfer Notification Letter sent to Attorney. (c/m 11/9/2023 bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2023 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-13409. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRANSFER ORDER- Case transferred to District of Maryland. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(sa)
September 29, 2023 Filing 9 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer of Orders, #2 Exhibit B - PTO, #3 Exhibit C - CMO, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Removal, #5 Exhibit E - Orders on Dispositive Motions, #6 Exhibit F - Daubert Orders, #7 Exhibit G - MIL Orders)(Britton, Mary)
June 2, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Theodore R McClain. Sanofi US Services Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC added. **See Rec. Doc 15926 filed in master case 16-md-2740** (am)
February 13, 2020 *** Party Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., McKesson Corporation and Pfizer Inc. terminated per Rec. Doc. 9270 in 16-MD-2740. (ecm)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ADI)
January 16, 2019 *** Party Actavis LLC terminated per Rec. Doc. 5934 in master case No. 16-md-2740. (caa)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (as)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and summons. The pdf should not have the green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action. No further action required. (as)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Notice of Voluntary Partial Dismissal; Document filed in wrong case. Document to be re-filed by clerk in master case 16-MD-2740. (ecm)
January 4, 2019 *** Party Actavis Pharma, Inc. terminated per Rec. Doc. 5708 in 16-md-2740. (ecm)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 *ERROR: Refiled in Master Case* NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice as to Actavis Pharma, Inc. by Theodora A McClain, Theodore R McClain. (Shkolnik, Hunter) Modified on 1/7/2019 (ecm).
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7296092) filed by Theodore R McClain, Theodora A McClain. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Sanofi US Services Inc., #3 Summons Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, #4 Summons Sandoz Inc., #5 Summons Accord Healthcare, Inc., #6 Summons McKesson Corporation, #7 Summons Hospira Worldwide, LLC, #8 Summons Hospira, Inc., #9 Summons Sun Pharma Global FZE, #10 Summons Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., #11 Summons Pfizer Inc., #12 Summons Actavis LLC, #13 Summons Actavis Pharma, Inc.)Attorney Hunter J. Shkolnik added to party Theodora A McClain(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter J. Shkolnik added to party Theodore R McClain(pty:pla).(Shkolnik, Hunter) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/15/2019) (as). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/15/2019) (as). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/15/2019) (as). (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/15/2019) (as). (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/15/2019) (as). (Attachment 5 replaced on 1/15/2019) (as). (Attachment 6 replaced on 1/15/2019) (as). (Attachment 7 replaced on 1/15/2019) (as). (Attachment 8 replaced on 1/15/2019) (as). (Attachment 9 replaced on 1/15/2019) (as). (Attachment 10 replaced on 1/15/2019) (as). (Attachment 11 replaced on 1/15/2019) (as). (Attachment 12 replaced on 1/15/2019) (as).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClain et al v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Represented By: Alexa Pauline Ain
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Dew
Represented By: Michael P O Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Represented By: Alexa Pauline Ain
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Dew
Represented By: Michael P O Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Represented By: Alexa Pauline Ain
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Dew
Represented By: Michael P O Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winthrop U.S. doing business as Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodora A McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore R McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?