Phillips v. British Airways PLC
Plaintiff: Melissa Phillips
Defendant: British Airways PLC
Case Number: 8:2023cv03066
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L Boardman
Referring Judge: Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Filing 27 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Marissa N. Lefland (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11019134) by British Airways PLC(Simon, Maria)
January 5, 2024 Filing 26 Correspondence re: (Goldhirsch, Lawrence)
January 5, 2024 Filing 25 QC NOTICE: #22 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by British Airways PLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2024 Filing 24 QC NOTICE: #21 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by British Airways PLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2024 Filing 23 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by British Airways PLC(Simon, Maria)
January 5, 2024 Filing 22 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Marissa N. Lefland (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11017717) by British Airways PLC(Simon, Maria)
January 5, 2024 Filing 21 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anthony U. Battista (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11017697) by British Airways PLC(Simon, Maria)
January 5, 2024 Filing 20 QC NOTICE: #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by British Airways PLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2024 Filing 19 QC NOTICE: #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by British Airways PLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anthony U. Battista (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11016382.) by British Airways PLC(Simon, Maria)
January 4, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Marissa N. Lefland (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11016343.) by British Airways PLC(Simon, Maria)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Paperless ORDER requesting the parties provide a joint proposed scheduling order within 14 days or file a joint status report indicating why such an order is inappropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 12/21/2023. (Quereshi, Ajmel)
December 21, 2023 Filing 14 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by British Airways PLC. (Attachments: # (FILED IN ERROR) (1) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Defendant's Certificate of Interested Parties, # (FILED IN ERROR) (3) General Consent to Appear Before Magistrate Judge)(Simon, Maria) Modified on 12/21/2023 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
December 21, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi no longer assigned to the case. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2023 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #4 Summons Issued 12/22/2023 by Melissa Phillips(Goldhirsch, Lawrence)
November 29, 2023 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lawrence Bertram Goldhirsch. Directing attorney Lawrence Bertram Goldhirsch to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 11/29/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Phillips. British Airways PLC served on 11/20/2023, answer due 12/11/2023., AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in A Civil Action, Complaint with Jury Demand, Consent to Exercise Of Jurisdiction by United States Judge served on British Airways on 11/20/2023, filed by Melissa Phillips.(Weiner, Jason)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 11/29/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lawrence Bertram Goldhirsch (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10952271.) by Melissa Phillips(Weiner, Jason)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Melissa Phillips to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/29/2023 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Melissa Phillips files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 11/29/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to British Airways PLC. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 11/14/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel A. Quereshi. Melissa Phillips or counsel for Melissa Phillips are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/28/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2023 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against British Airways PLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10920810.), filed by Melissa Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Weiner, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. British Airways PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Phillips
Represented By: Jason M Weiner
Represented By: Lawrence Bertram Goldhirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Airways PLC
Represented By: Maria C Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?