Robinson v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sabrina Robinson
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Case Number: 8:2023cv03083
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for Settlement. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/20/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2023 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher S. McRae. Directing attorney Christopher S. McRae to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 11/29/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2023 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jason T Brown. Directing attorney Jason T Brown to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 11/22/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher S. McRae (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10942423.) by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC(Dew, Ellen)
November 21, 2023 Filing 16 Correspondence re: Ten Remanded Cases Be Designated As Related (Dew, Ellen)
November 20, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jason T. Brown (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10939552.) by Sabrina Robinson(Rubin, James)
November 20, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James Edward Rubin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rubin, James)
November 15, 2023 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(Dew, Ellen)
November 15, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Elizabeth Dew on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Dew, Ellen)
November 15, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Pauline Ain on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Ain, Alexa)
November 15, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P O Day on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (O Day, Michael)
November 15, 2023 Deficiency Notice for Sanofi US Services Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 11/22/2023 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2023 Filing 9 Correspondence from Clerk re: Transfer Notification Letter (c/em def atty 11/13/23 ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2023 Filing 8 Correspondence from Clerk re: Transfer Notification Letter (c/em pl atty 11/13/23 ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2023 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-12265. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER- Case transferred to District of Maryland. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(sa)
September 29, 2023 Filing 5 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Britton, Mary)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ADI)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (sbs)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7277692) filed by Sabrina Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Jason Travis Brown added to party Sabrina Robinson(pty:pla).(Brown, Jason) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Alexa Pauline Ain
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Dew
Represented By: Michael P O Day
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Alexa Pauline Ain
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Dew
Represented By: Michael P O Day
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Alexa Pauline Ain
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Dew
Represented By: Michael P O Day
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Robinson
Represented By: James Edward Rubin
Represented By: Jason T Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?