Ferguson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Joseph Ferguson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Ssaogcomms SSA Notify
Case Number: 8:2023cv03095
Filed: November 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles D Austin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin on 12/6/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2023 Filing 6 Consent to Magistrate Judge (McCaul, Jason)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin on 11/22/2023. (cw5s, Chambers)
November 15, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin. Pursuant to Standing Order 2021-12, which can be downloaded #here, Joseph Ferguson or counsel for Joseph Ferguson has 30 days from the date of this notice to file their consent or declination to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent or declination, go to Civil > Correspondence > Magistrate Judge - consent/decline. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/15/2023.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Kelly M Marzullo on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. A certified copy of the transcript of the record is due on 1/16/2024 unless otherwise ordered. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Ferguson. (McCaul, Jason)
November 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Joseph Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCaul, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Ferguson
Represented By: Jason Patrick McCaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ssaogcomms SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?