Taswell v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Denyse Taswell
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi S.A., Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Winthrop U.S. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Case Number: 8:2023cv03181
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for Settlement. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/20/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2023 Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher S. McRae. Directing attorney Christopher S. McRae to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher S. McRae (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10964552.) by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC(Dew, Ellen)
December 4, 2023 Filing 19 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Dew, Ellen)
December 1, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Pauline Ain on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Ain, Alexa)
November 30, 2023 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(Dew, Ellen)
November 30, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Elizabeth Dew on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Dew, Ellen)
November 30, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P O Day on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (O Day, Michael)
November 21, 2023 Filing 14 Correspondence to counsel re: transfer notification letter. (c/m 11/21/2023 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-08592. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to District of Maryland. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go)
September 29, 2023 Filing 11 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Brilleaux, Kelly)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI)
September 6, 2017 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Winthrop U.S.. (cc)
September 5, 2017 Filing 7 Request of Summons Issued as to Winthrop U.S. filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Kagan, Andrew)
September 5, 2017 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Kagan, Andrew)
September 5, 2017 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Sanofi S.A. filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Kagan, Andrew)
September 5, 2017 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Kagan, Andrew)
September 5, 2017 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Aventis Pharma S.A. filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Kagan, Andrew)
September 5, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (jeg)
September 1, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6339301) filed by Denyse Taswell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Andrew Thomas Kagan added to party Denyse Taswell(pty:pla).(Kagan, Andrew) Modified text on 9/5/2017 (tm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taswell v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Dew
Represented By: Michael P O Day
Represented By: Alexa Pauline Ain
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Dew
Represented By: Michael P O Day
Represented By: Alexa Pauline Ain
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winthrop U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Dew
Represented By: Michael P O Day
Represented By: Alexa Pauline Ain
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denyse Taswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?