Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC v. Monster Investments, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC
Defendant: Monster Investments, Inc., K L A R, Inc. and Donald I. Bernard
Case Number: 8:2023cv03244
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Referring Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC. Monster Investments, Inc. served on 1/8/2024, answer due 1/29/2024.(Lee-Ghosal, Caroline)
January 16, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC. K L A R, Inc. served on 1/9/2024, answer due 1/30/2024.(Lee-Ghosal, Caroline)
January 16, 2024 Filing 17 QC NOTICE: #15 Affidavit filed by Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC, #16 Affidavit filed by Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC was filed incorrectly. **Wrong event used. In the future, please file these by selecting Service of Process, Summons Returned Executed, and follow the prompts to set an answer deadline. Your filing has been accepted by court staff and no further action is necessary. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC(Lee-Ghosal, Caroline) Modified on 1/16/2024 (bw5s, Deputy Clerk).
January 16, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC(Lee-Ghosal, Caroline) Modified on 1/16/2024 (bw5s, Deputy Clerk).
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #13 motion to withdraw and WITHDRAWING #9 motion Clerk's entry of default as to Donald Bernard. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 1/11/2024. (sat, Chambers)
January 11, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw #9 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee-Ghosal, Caroline)
January 11, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE by Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC Regarding Deadline to Respond to Complaint (Lee-Ghosal, Caroline)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #10 motion for alternative service of process as to Defendants Monster Investments, Inc. and K L A R, Inc. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 1/8/2024. (sat, Chambers)
January 5, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Alternative Service by Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee-Ghosal, Caroline)
January 5, 2024 Filing 9 [WITHDRAWN] MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lee-Ghosal, Caroline) Modified on 1/12/2024 (bw5s, Deputy Clerk).
December 15, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC. Donald I. Bernard served on 12/5/2023, answer due 12/26/2023.(Lee-Ghosal, Caroline)
December 7, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC. K L A R, Inc. served on 12/5/2023, answer due 12/26/2023.(Lee-Ghosal, Caroline)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/1/2023. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC or counsel for Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/15/2023. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Donald I. Bernard, K L A R, Inc., Monster Investments, Inc.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2023 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC (Glaser, Christopher)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10953623.), filed by Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Glaser, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC v. Monster Investments, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stormfield Capital Funding I, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Allan Glaser
Represented By: Caroline Y. Lee-Ghosal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monster Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K L A R, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald I. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?