Nixon v. The Laundress, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Michelle Nixon
Defendant: The Laundress, LLC, Conopco, Inc. d/b/a Unilever Home & Personal Care USA and Conopco, Inc. doing business as Unilever Home & Personal Care USA
Case Number: 8:2023cv03245
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael A. McCaskey. Directing attorney Michael A. McCaskey to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 1/26/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2024 Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Caitlin M. Barry. Directing attorney Caitlin M. Barry to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 1/26/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 25, 2024 Filing 21 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael A. McCaskey by The Laundress, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Hogan, Patrick)
January 25, 2024 Filing 20 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Caitlin M. Barry by The Laundress, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Hogan, Patrick)
January 25, 2024 Filing 19 QC NOTICE: #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by The Laundress, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 25, 2024 Filing 18 QC NOTICE: #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by The Laundress, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Caitlin M. Barry (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11040831.) by The Laundress, LLC(Hogan, Patrick)
January 19, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael A. McCaskey (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11040770.) by The Laundress, LLC(Hogan, Patrick)
January 16, 2024 Case Reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi no longer assigned to the case. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Paperless ORDER approving stipulation in ECF No. 12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 12/29/2023. (Quereshi, Ajmel)
December 29, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel A. Quereshi. Conopco, Inc., The Laundress, LLC or counsel for Conopco, Inc., The Laundress, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/12/2024. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, and Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law by Conopco, Inc., The Laundress, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hogan, Patrick)
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick E Hogan on behalf of Conopco, Inc., The Laundress, LLC (Hogan, Patrick)
December 20, 2023 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Adam John Kress. Directing attorney Adam John Kress to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 19, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Adam J. Kress (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10994452.) by Stephanie Michelle Nixon(Jenner, Robert)
December 14, 2023 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Anna R. Rick. Directing attorney Anna R. Rick to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/14/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anna R. Rick (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10985948.) by Stephanie Michelle Nixon(Jenner, Robert)
December 12, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Michelle Nixon. Conopco, Inc. served on 12/5/2023, answer due 12/26/2023.(Jenner, Robert)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 11/30/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel A. Quereshi. Plaintiff Stephanie Michelle Nixon or counsel for Stephanie Michelle Nixon are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/14/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to The Laundress, LLC, Conopco, Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2023 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Conopco, Inc. d/b/a Unilever Home & Personal Care USA, The Laundress, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10953643.), filed by Stephanie Michelle Nixon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Jenner, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nixon v. The Laundress, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Michelle Nixon
Represented By: Robert Keith Jenner
Represented By: Adam John Kress
Represented By: Anna R. Rick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Laundress, LLC
Represented By: Caitlin M. Barry
Represented By: Michael A. McCaskey
Represented By: Patrick E Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco, Inc. d/b/a Unilever Home & Personal Care USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco, Inc. doing business as Unilever Home & Personal Care USA
Represented By: Patrick E Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?