SKAOS MD LLC v. Magnolia Gardens Limited Partnership
Plaintiff: SKAOS MD LLC
Defendant: Magnolia Gardens Limited Partnership
Case Number: 8:2023cv03411
Filed: December 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Referring Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by SKAOS MD LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fletcher, Robert)
February 9, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Magnolia Gardens Limited Partnership (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caiola, Paul)
January 29, 2024 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Circuit Court for Charles County, Maryland) filed by SKAOS MD LLC.(Fletcher, Robert)
January 19, 2024 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Circuit Court for Charles County, Maryland) filed by Magnolia Gardens Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18)(Caiola, Paul)
January 5, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Circuit Court for Charles County, Maryland) by SKAOS MD LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fletcher, Robert)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiff Skaos MD LLC's motion to withdraw (ECF No. 15) its motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction at ECF No. 10; and cancelling the in-person hearing on December 29, 2023. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 12/27/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk).
December 26, 2023 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Magnolia Gardens Limited Partnership (Caiola, Paul)
December 26, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE by SKAOS MD LLC re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Fletcher, Robert)
December 21, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Magnolia Gardens Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Attachment Table of Exhibits)(Caiola, Paul)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER setting out a briefing and hearing schedule as follows: December 21, 2023, Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order; December 26, 2023, Plaintiff shall file its reply; December 28, 2023, parties shall file a status report(s) with their list of proposed witnesses and brief description of intended testimony; December 29, 2023, the Court will hold an in-person hearing for the motion at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2C.. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 12/20/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 Telephone Conference held on 12/20/2023 before Judge Paula Xinis. (FTR - Gomez - 2C) (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER: A recorded call has been scheduled for today, December 20, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. Instructions will be emailed to the parties. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 12/20/2023. (tb2s, Chambers)
December 20, 2023 Filing 10 [WITHDRAWN] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by SKAOS MD LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fletcher, Robert) Modified on 12/27/2023 (mg3s, Deputy Clerk).
December 19, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Stephen Caiola on behalf of Magnolia Gardens Limited Partnership (Caiola, Paul)
December 19, 2023 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by SKAOS MD LLC (Fletcher, Robert)
December 19, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Paula Xinis. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/18/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Magnolia Gardens Limited Partnership or counsel for Magnolia Gardens Limited Partnership are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/2/2024. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. SKAOS MD LLC or counsel for SKAOS MD LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/2/2024. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2023 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2023 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 12/26/2023 (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2023 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Magnolia Gardens Limited Partnership, filed by SKAOS MD LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2023 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR CHARLES COUNTY. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Charles County, case number C-08-CV-23-000961. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-10991323), filed by Magnolia Gardens Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kannan, Sangeetha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SKAOS MD LLC v. Magnolia Gardens Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SKAOS MD LLC
Represented By: Robert P Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnolia Gardens Limited Partnership
Represented By: Sangeetha Kannan
Represented By: Paul Stephen Caiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?