Bell, et al v. Caruso Homes, Inc, et al
Plaintiff: Erica Bell
Defendant: Xana Colvin, Carlos Colvin, Kymm Watson, Caruso Homes, Inc., CARUSO SIGNATURE CLUB MGT, LLC, NVR, INC. d/b/a RYAN HOMES, SIGNATURE 2016 RESIDENTIAL, LLC, SIGNATURE CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., VIKA MARYLAND, LLC, Delmarva Site Development, Inc., AIRVAC, INC., NVR, Inc., Signature Club Homeowners Association, Inc and Airvac, Inc
Case Number: 8:2024cv00157
Filed: January 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Lydia Kay Griggsby
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Deceptive Trade Practices
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Griffin on behalf of Signature Club Homeowners Association, Inc (Griffin, Sean)
March 7, 2024 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Colvin, Xana Colvin, Erica Bell, Kymm Watson. Airvac, Inc waiver sent on 2/6/2024, answer due 4/8/2024.(LaFramboise, Drew)
March 7, 2024 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Colvin, Xana Colvin, Erica Bell, Kymm Watson. NVR, Inc. waiver sent on 2/6/2024, answer due 4/8/2024.(LaFramboise, Drew)
February 29, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachelle A Schofield on behalf of Delmarva Site Development, Inc. (Schofield, Rachelle)
February 29, 2024 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Colvin, Xana Colvin, Erica Bell, Kymm Watson. Delmarva Site Development, Inc. waiver sent on 2/6/2024, answer due 4/8/2024.(LaFramboise, Drew)
February 29, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Joseph MacDonald on behalf of Delmarva Site Development, Inc. (MacDonald, Neil)
February 29, 2024 Filing 19 (FILED IN ERROR BY COUNSEL) NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Joseph MacDonald on behalf of Delmarva Site Development, Inc. (MacDonald, Neil) Modified on 2/29/2024 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
February 28, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore B Kiviat on behalf of Signature 2016 Residential, LLC (Kiviat, Theodore)
February 28, 2024 The case of Bell, et al v. Caruso Homes, Inc, et al, has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is 8:24-cv-00157-LKG. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours. To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents. Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2024 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 405, receipt number AMDDC-11115477(Markovitz, Brian)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 2/26/2024. (mu1s, Chambers)
February 21, 2024 Case Reassigned to Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam L Van Grack on behalf of Signature 2016 Residential, LLC (Van Grack, Adam)
February 16, 2024 Filing 14 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Shannon, Joseph)
February 16, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Vika Maryland, LLC. Vika Maryland, LLC waiver sent on 2/6/2024, answer due 4/8/2024.(Shannon, Joseph)
February 16, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Scott Shannon on behalf of Vika Maryland, LLC (Shannon, Joseph)
February 16, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan C. Shoemaker on behalf of Vika Maryland, LLC (Shoemaker, Jonathan)
February 9, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Colvin, Xana Colvin, Erica Bell, Kymm Watson. Signature 2016 Residential, LLC waiver sent on 2/6/2024, answer due 4/8/2024.(LaFramboise, Drew)
February 9, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Colvin, Xana Colvin, Erica Bell, Kymm Watson. Caruso Signature Club Mgt, LLC waiver sent on 2/6/2024, answer due 4/8/2024.(LaFramboise, Drew)
February 9, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Colvin, Xana Colvin, Erica Bell, Kymm Watson. Caruso Homes, Inc. waiver sent on 2/6/2024, answer due 4/8/2024.(LaFramboise, Drew)
February 9, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Colvin, Xana Colvin, Erica Bell, Kymm Watson. Signature Club Homeowners Association, Inc waiver sent on 2/6/2024, answer due 4/8/2024.(LaFramboise, Drew)
January 22, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew LaFramboise on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LaFramboise, Drew)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 1/19/2024. (ah8s, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel A. Quereshi. Erica Bell, Carlos Colvin, Xana Colvin, Kymm Watson or counsel for Erica Bell, Carlos Colvin, Xana Colvin, Kymm Watson are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 2/2/2024. (ah8s, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to AIRVAC, INC., CARUSO HOMES, INC, CARUSO SIGNATURE CLUB MGT, LLC, DELMARVA SITE DEVELOPMENT, INC, NVR, INC. d/b/a RYAN HOMES, SIGNATURE 2016 RESIDENTIAL, LLC, SIGNATURE CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., VIKA MARYLAND, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(ah8s, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2024 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by Erica Bell. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Markovitz, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell, et al v. Caruso Homes, Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Bell
Represented By: Brian Joseph Markovitz
Represented By: Drew LaFramboise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xana Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kymm Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caruso Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARUSO SIGNATURE CLUB MGT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NVR, INC. d/b/a RYAN HOMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIGNATURE 2016 RESIDENTIAL, LLC
Represented By: Adam L Van Grack
Represented By: Theodore B Kiviat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIGNATURE CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIKA MARYLAND, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan C. Shoemaker
Represented By: Joseph Scott Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delmarva Site Development, Inc.
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Represented By: Rachelle A Schofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIRVAC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NVR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Club Homeowners Association, Inc
Represented By: Sean Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airvac, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?