Encompass Indemnity Company et al v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Encompass Indemnity Company, Charles Jordan and Natalia Jordan
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., TTI Outdoor Power Equipment, Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc. f/k/a One World Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries Co. Ltd., Ryobi Ltd., Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., The Home Depot, Inc. and Home Depot Product Authority, LLC
Case Number: 8:2024cv00690
Filed: March 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Lydia Kay Griggsby
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #5 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions filed by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC, Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc. f/k/a One World Technologies, Inc., TTI Outdoor Power Equipment, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., The Home Depot, Inc..(Hines, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2024 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc. f/k/a One World Technologies, Inc., TTI Outdoor Power Equipment, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. (Hines, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2024 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Hines, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2024 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Ciamaichelo. Directing attorney Michael Ciamaichelo to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
March 13, 2024 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Encompass Indemnity Company (Kikendall, Anthony)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 3/11/2024. (mu1s, Chambers)
March 11, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Ciamaichelo (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11138014.) by Encompass Indemnity Company(Kikendall, Anthony)
March 8, 2024 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Home Depot Product Authority, LLC, Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., Ryobi Ltd., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc. f/k/a One World Technologies, Inc., TTI Outdoor Power Equipment, Inc., Techtronic Industries Co. Ltd., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., The Home Depot, Inc., filed by Encompass Indemnity Company.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2024 Jury Trial Demand by Encompass Indemnity Company(bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2024 THE ABOVE DOCUMENT (4) IS A COPY OF ORIGINAL PAPER FILED IN THE PRINCE GEORGE"S COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2024 Filing 3 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Encompass Indemnity Co. by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC, Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., The Home Depot, Inc..(Hines, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2024 Filing 2 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Emcompass Indemnity Co. by TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc. f/k/a One World Technologies, Inc., TTI Outdoor Power Equipment, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc..(Hines, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL , filed by TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc. f/k/a One World Technologies, Inc., Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit A-1, #5 Exhibit A-2)(Hines, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Encompass Indemnity Company et al v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Encompass Indemnity Company
Represented By: Anthony Jude Magnetti Kikendall
Represented By: Michael Ciamaichelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Jordan
Represented By: Anthony Jude Magnetti Kikendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Jordan
Represented By: Anthony Jude Magnetti Kikendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Jerome Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TTI Outdoor Power Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Jerome Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc. f/k/a One World Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Jerome Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryobi Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Jerome Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Jerome Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot Product Authority, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Jerome Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?