Aria Diagnostics LLC v. Brij Strategic Consultations LLC
Plaintiff: Aria Diagnostics LLC
Defendant: Brij Strategic Consultations LLC
Case Number: 8:2024cv00965
Filed: April 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 Filing 17 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Brij Strategic Consultations LLC.(Kayal, Devashis)
May 6, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E Kenney on behalf of Brij Strategic Consultations LLC (Kenney, Daniel)
May 6, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Brij Strategic Consultations LLC.(Kenney, Daniel)
April 22, 2024 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brij Strategic Consultations LLC, filed by Aria Diagnostics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Complaint (redlined))(Young, Christopher)
April 22, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by Aria Diagnostics LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Young, Christopher)
April 17, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #5 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions filed by Brij Strategic Consultations LLC.(Kayal, Devashis)
April 11, 2024 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Aria Diagnostics LLC identifying Corporate Parent Soros Clinical Solutions LLC for Aria Diagnostics LLC.(Young, Christopher)
April 5, 2024 Filing 10 PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Counts II and III of Complaint by Brij Strategic Consultations LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kayal, Devashis)
April 5, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Aneerban Ari Ghosal on behalf of Brij Strategic Consultations LLC (Ghosal, Aneerban)
April 4, 2024 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #7 Notice (Other), filed by Brij Strategic Consultations LLC was filed incorrectly. **Documents were not labeled by name of pleading pursuant to previous QC notice. The Court has made the necessary corrections. No futher action required. Please note for future. Thank you. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE by Brij Strategic Consultations LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Exh filed separately (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-Maryland Judiciary Case Search Case Information Sheet #2 Exhibit C- Declaration of Mukesh Kumar in Support of Removal, #3 Exhibit D- Notice of Appearance)(Kayal, Devashis) Modified on 4/4/2024 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
April 4, 2024 Filing 6 QC NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Brij Strategic Consultations LLC. **According to this Court's Filing Procedures for Removals (see https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/content/removals), each state court document must be filed as a separate PDF attachment to the notice of removal, and properly labeled as to what the state court document is (i.e., Complaint, Answer, etc.). Please re-file Exhibit 1 (A-D) to your Removal using the event "notice (other)", following the above instructions, and link the attachments to #1 Notice of Removal. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2024 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 3, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Brij Strategic Consultations LLC, filed by Aria Diagnostics LLC. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 3, 2024 THE ABOVE DOCUMENT (4) IS A COPY OF ORIGINAL PAPER FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 3, 2024 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.5(Kayal, Devashis)
April 3, 2024 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Brij Strategic Consultations LLC (Kayal, Devashis)
April 3, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from THE CIRCUIT COURT OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, MARYLAND, case number C-15-CV-24-000936. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11181451), filed by Brij Strategic Consultations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A through D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kayal, Devashis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aria Diagnostics LLC v. Brij Strategic Consultations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aria Diagnostics LLC
Represented By: Christopher S Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brij Strategic Consultations LLC
Represented By: Devashis A Kayal
Represented By: Aneerban Ari Ghosal
Represented By: Daniel E Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?