Sodexo, Inc. et al v. Agri Stats, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sodexo, Inc. and Sodexo Operations, LLC
Defendant: Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Clemens Family Corporation, Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2024cv00978
Filed: April 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 Filing 26 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER received from MDL Panel. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete, Clerk of the Panel on 4/30/2024. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2024 Case Electronically Transferred to The District of Minnesota. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 2, 2024 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.. Agri Stats, Inc. served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024; Clemens Food Group, LLC served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024.(Thomsen, Martha)
May 2, 2024 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.. Clemens Family Corporation served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024; Hormel Foods Corporation served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024; Hormel Foods, LLC served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024; Seaboard Corporation served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024; Seaboard Foods, LLC served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024; Triumph Foods, LLC served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024; Tyson Foods, Inc. served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024; Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024; Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024.(Thomsen, Martha)
April 23, 2024 Filing 23 Summons Issued 21 days as to Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2024 Filing 22 Summons Issued 21 days as to Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Family Corporation, Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/23/2024 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk).
April 17, 2024 Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ariel D. House. Directing attorney Ariel D. House to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/17/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 17, 2024 Filing 20 QC NOTICE: #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sodexo, Inc., Sodexo Operations, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 16, 2024 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Family Corporation, Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Redline)(Thomsen, Martha) Modified on 4/23/2024
April 16, 2024 Filing 18 QC NOTICE: #17 Amended Complaint, filed by Sodexo, Inc., Sodexo Operations, LLC needs to be corrected. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Redline copy has not been filed. Please re-file the clean version of the amended complaint as the main document and the redline version as an attachment to the amended complaint. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2024 Filing 17 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Family Corporation, Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc..(Thomsen, Martha) Modified on 4/16/2024 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk).
April 15, 2024 Filing 16 (FILED IN ERROR PER COUNSEL)AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc., filed by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc..(Thomsen, Martha) Modified on 4/16/2024 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk).
April 15, 2024 Filing 15 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ariel D. House by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Thomsen, Martha)
April 15, 2024 Filing 14 Second MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ariel D. House (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11204510.) by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.(Thomsen, Martha)
April 12, 2024 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sodexo, Inc. for Sodexo, Inc..(Thomsen, Martha)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew T. George terminated. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/12/2024. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 11, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew T. George by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomsen, Martha)
April 10, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha S Thomsen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thomsen, Martha)
April 9, 2024 Deficiency Notice as to Sodexo, Inc.-- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 4/16/2024 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Plaintiff 14 days to Amend Complaint that complies with Local Rules; Plaintiff's Complaint is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/8/2024. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2024 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sodexo, Inc., Sodexo Operations, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2024 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher P. Wilson. Directing attorney Christopher P. Wilson to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/8/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons Agri Stats, Inc., #2 Summons Clemens Family Corporation, #3 Summons Clemens Food Group, LLC, #4 Summons Hormel Foods Corporation, #5 Summons Hormel Foods, LLC, #6 Summons Seaboard Corporation, #7 Sumons Seaboard Foods LLC, #8 Summons Triumph Foods, LLC, #9 Summons Tyson Foods, Inc., #10 Summons Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., #11 Summons Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.)(George, Andrew)
April 5, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ariel D. House (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11187684.) by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.(George, Andrew)
April 5, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher P. Wilson (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11186920.) by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.(George, Andrew)
April 4, 2024 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Sodexo, Inc., Sodexo Operations, LLC was filed incorrectly. ***Please file a proposed summons for each party on the case.Use the event > Other Filings > Notices > Notice(Other) and link to Compliant. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/4/2024. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Family Corporation, Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11183723.), filed by Sodexo Operations, LLC, Sodexo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(George, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sodexo, Inc. et al v. Agri Stats, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sodexo, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew T. George
Represented By: Martha S Thomsen
Represented By: Ariel D. House
Represented By: Christopher P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sodexo Operations, LLC
Represented By: Andrew T. George
Represented By: Martha S Thomsen
Represented By: Ariel D. House
Represented By: Christopher P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agri Stats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemens Food Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemens Family Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hormel Foods Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hormel Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaboard Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaboard Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triumph Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?