Adelson v. Oakland, County of et al
Plaintiff: Wendy Adelson and Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER]
Defendant: County of Oakland, Doe John, John #1 Doe, John #2 Doe, John #3 Doe, John #4 Doe, John #5 Doe, John #6 Doe, John #7 Doe, John #8 Doe, John #9 Doe, John #10 Doe, John #11 Doe, John #12 Doe, Oakland, County of and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2023cv11291
Filed: May 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Jonathan JC Grey
2 Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2023 Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey: Scheduling Conference held on 7/26/2023 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (SOso)
July 18, 2023 Filing 16 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Freifeld, Michael)
July 17, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Waun on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Waun, Thomas)
July 13, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Freifeld on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Freifeld, Michael)
July 11, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Scheduling Conference set for 7/26/2023 02:30 PM before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey ***Parties are to file FRCP 26(f) one week prior to conference*** (SOso)
July 7, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Oakland, County of. (Potter, Steven)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of Attorney Substitution with Stipulation. Attorney Aristidi Demetrios Papaioannou for Wendy Adelson added. Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
June 26, 2023 Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Laurie J. Michelson to District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey pursuant to Administrative Order 23-AO-022. Except in cases previously referred to a magistrate judge, existing scheduling orders and motion hearing dates are suspended. Status conferences will be scheduled in the near future for general civil cases. Cases referred to a magistrate judge will keep all previously scheduled dates. (SSch)
June 21, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Summons Issued by All Plaintiffs (Hatchett, Ayanna) Modified on 6/21/2023 (SSch). [Summons Returned Executed 6/16/23]
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
June 9, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Layla Rose Sizemore on behalf of All Defendants. (Sizemore, Layla)
June 9, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor S. Potter on behalf of All Defendants. (Potter, Trevor)
June 9, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Clark on behalf of All Defendants. (Clark, Robert)
June 9, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Potter on behalf of All Defendants. (Potter, Steven)
June 7, 2023 Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS. (EPar)
June 1, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Oakland, County of* (KBro)
June 1, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (KBro)
May 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against Wendy Adelson with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9368510 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Hatchett, Ayanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adelson v. Oakland, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Adelson
Represented By: Ayanna D. Hatchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER]
Represented By: Aristidi Demetrios Papaioannou
Represented By: Ayanna D. Hatchett
Represented By: Michael E. Freifeld
Represented By: Thomas W. Waun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John #1 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John #2 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John #3 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John #4 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John #5 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John #6 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John #7 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John #8 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John #9 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John #10 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John #11 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John #12 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland, County of
Represented By: Layla Rose Sizemore
Represented By: Robert C. Clark
Represented By: Steven M. Potter
Represented By: Trevor S. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Layla Rose Sizemore
Represented By: Robert C. Clark
Represented By: Steven M. Potter
Represented By: Trevor S. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?