Calkins et al v. Kent, County of et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Mindy Calkins, Kerry Mark Properties, LLC, Mr. Ali Abdulmajeed Al-Faraj, Ali Al-Faraj and Mindy Calkins
Defendant: Jennifer Goudreau, Muskegon, County of, Hillsdale, County of, Iron, County of, Ionia, County of, Sally L. Brooks, Wexford, County of, Van Buren, County of, Andrew Kmeetz, III, Anne Koski, Sherry A. Comben, Kent, County of, Kalkaska, County of, Kellie Allen, Joanne Vukin, Manistee, County of, Melanie Camps, Kristi Nottingham, Tonia Hartline, Jill C. Tollefson, Shelly Weich, Mr. Peter Macgregor, Kalamazoo, County of, Treasurer Trisha Nesbitt, Allegan, County of, Pamela Johnson, Michelle Thompson, Eric Schertzing, Calhoun, County of, Lake, County of, Baraga, County of, Mary Balkema, Berrien, County of, Judith Ratering, Lorna Carey, Delta, County of, Bret E. Witkowski, Ontonagon, County of, Rachel nelson, Eaton, County of, Cass, County of, Ottawa, County of, Oceana, County of, Grand Traverse, County of, Susan Vandercar, Montcalm, County of, Brian Wensauer, Missaukee, County of, Chippewa, County of, Valerie Thornburg, Mr. Kenneth D. Parrish, Heidi Scheppe, Lisa Hewitt, John Gallagher, III, Holly Moon, Mackinac, County of, Newaygo, County of, Alger, County of, Julie Roscioli, Hope Anderson, Emmet, County of, Houghton, County of, Thomas Whitener, Lisa Mattila, Jeanne Pollard, Gogebic, County of, Amanda Price, Nicholas Benson, Mary Mitchell, Antrim, County of, Benzie, County of, Mary Lou Phillips, Stephenie Kyser, Barbara A. Parrett, Carmen Fazzari, Tony Moulatsiotis, Marquette, County of, Mason, County of, Lori Cox, Osceola, County of, Judith A. Clark, Sherry Godfrey, Dickinson, County of, Ingham, County of, Lori Leademan, Brenda Kutchinski, Barry, County of, St. Joseph, County of, Schoolcraft, County of, Leelanau, County of, Robert Robinson, Kathy Humphries, Menominee, County of, Judith L. Ratering, Peter Macgregor, Lori Leudeman, Brian W. Wensauer, Kenneth D. Parrish, Andrew R. Kmeetz, IV, Jeanne M. Pollard, Anne T. Koski, Trisha Nesbitt and Brenda L. Kutchinski
Case Number: 1:2021cv00062
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Allan C. Vander Laan on behalf of defendants Alger, County of, Allegan, County of, Kellie Allen, Hope Anderson, Antrim, County of, Mary Balkema, Barry, County of, Nicholas Benson, Benzie, County of, Berrien, County of, Sally L. Brooks, Calhoun, County of, Melanie Camps, Lorna Carey, Cass, County of, Chippewa, County of, Judith A. Clark, Sherry A. Comben, Lori Cox, Delta, County of, Dickinson, County of, Eaton, County of, Emmet, County of, Carmen Fazzari, John Gallagher, III, Sherry Godfrey, Gogebic, County of, Jennifer Goudreau, Grand Traverse, County of, Tonia Hartline, Lisa Hewitt, Hillsdale, County of, Houghton, County of, Kathy Humphries, Ingham, County of, Ionia, County of, Iron, County of, Pamela Johnson, Kalamazoo, County of, Kalkaska, County of, Andrew R. Kmeetz, IV, Anne T. Koski, Brenda L. Kutchinski, Stephenie Kyser, Lake, County of, Leelanau, County of, Lori Leudeman, Mackinac, County of, Manistee, County of, Marquette, County of, Mason, County of, Lisa Mattila, Menominee, County of, Missaukee, County of, Mary Mitchell, Montcalm, County of, Holly Moon, Tony Moulatsiotis, Muskegon, County of, Rachel Nelson, Newaygo, County of, Kristi Nottingham, Oceana, County of, Osceola, County of, Barbara A. Parrett, Mary Lou Phillips, Judith L. Ratering, Robert Robinson, Julie Roscioli, Heidi Scheppe, Eric Schertzing, Schoolcraft, County of, St. Joseph, County of, Michelle Thompson, Valerie Thornburg, Susan Vandercar, Joanne Vukin, Shelly Weich, Brian W. Wensauer, Wexford, County of, Thomas Whitener, Bret E. Witkowski (Vander Laan, Allan)
March 19, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS returned executed; Amanda Price served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021 (Visser, Donald)
March 19, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed; Ottawa, County of served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021 (Visser, Donald)
March 18, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion, #16 filed by Kent, County of, Peter Macgregor, Trisha Nesbitt, Ottawa, County of, Kenneth D. Parrish, Amanda Price, Van Buren, County of (Nelson, Matthew)
March 18, 2021 Filing 16 BRIEF in support of JOINT MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #15 filed by Kent, County of, Peter Macgregor, Trisha Nesbitt, Ottawa, County of, Kenneth D. Parrish, Amanda Price, Van Buren, County of (Nelson, Matthew) Modified text on 3/19/2021 (eod)
March 18, 2021 Filing 15 JOINT MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants Kent, County of, Peter Macgregor, Trisha Nesbitt, Ottawa, County of, Kenneth D. Parrish, Amanda Price, Van Buren, County of; (Nelson, Matthew) Modified text on 3/19/2021 (eod)
March 18, 2021 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Alger, County of; Allegan, County of; Kellie Allen; Hope Anderson; Antrim, County of; Mary Balkema; Barry, County of; Nicholas Benson; Benzie, County of; Berrien, County of; Sally L. Brooks; Calhoun, County of; Melanie Camps; Lorna Carey;Cass, County of; Chippewa, County of; Judith A. Clark; Sherry A. Comben;Lori Cox; Delta, County of; Dickinson, County of; Eaton, County of; Emmet, County of; Carmen Fazzari; John Gallagher, III; Sherry Godfrey; Gogebic, County of; Jennifer Goudreau; Grand Traverse, County of; Tonia Hartline; Lisa Hewitt; Hillsdale, County of; Houghton, County of; Kathy Humphries; Ingham, County of; Ionia, County of; Iron, County of; Pamela Johnson; Kalamazoo, County of; Kalkaska, County of; Andrew R. Kmeetz, IV; Brenda L. Kutchinski; Stephenie Kyser; Lake, County of; Leelanau, County of; Lori Leudeman; Mackinac, County of; Manistee, County of; Marquette, County of; Mason, County of; Lisa Mattila; Menominee, County of; Missaukee, County of; Mary Mitchell; Montcalm, County of; Holly Moon; Tony Moulatsiotis; Muskegon, County of; Rachel Nelson; Newaygo, County of; Kristi Nottingham; Oceana, County of; Osceola, County of; Barbara A. Parrett; Mary Lou Phillips; Judith L. Ratering; Robert Robinson; Julie Roscioli; Heidi Scheppe; Eric Schertzing; Schoolcraft, County of; St. Joseph, County of; Michelle Thompson; Valerie Thornburg; Susan Vandercar; Joanne Vukin; Shelly Weich; Brian W. Wensauer; Wexford, County of; Thomas Whitener; and Bret E. Witkowski served on 3/18/2021, answer due 4/8/2021 (Visser, Donald) Modified text on 3/19/2021 (eod)
February 15, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Matthew T. Nelson on behalf of defendants Kent, County of, Peter Macgregor, Kenneth D. Parrish (Nelson, Matthew)
February 11, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE to attorney Donald R. Visser regarding recent filing #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 (eod)
February 11, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed; Trisha Nesbitt of served on 2/5/2021 (Visser, Donald) Modified text on 2/12/2021 (eod)
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed; Van Buren County of served on 2/5/2021 (Visser, Donald) Modified text on 2/12/2021 (eod)
February 11, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed;Peter MacGregor of served on 2/9/2021 (Visser, Donald) Modified text on 2/12/2021 (eod)
February 11, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; Kenneth D. Parrish served on 2/9/2021 (Visser, Donald) Modified text on 2/12/2021 (eod)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed as to Kent, County of served on 02/09/2021 (Visser, Donald) Modified text on 2/12/2021 (eod)
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ali Al-Faraj, Mindy Calkins, Kerry Mark Properties, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Notice of Judgment Kent County, #2 Exhibit 2 Certificate of Treasurer Judgment Kalamazoo County, #3 Exhibit 3 Notice of Judgment Van Buren County) (Visser, Donald) Modified text on 2/5/2021 (eod)
February 4, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Shawn E. Gillum on behalf of plaintiffs Ali Al-Faraj, Mindy Calkins, Kerry Mark Properties, LLC (Gillum, Shawn)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Kent, County of, Peter Macgregor, Trisha Nesbitt, Ottawa, County of, Kenneth D. Parrish, Amanda Price, Van Buren, County of (ns)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Visser, Donald)
January 27, 2021 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Alger, County of, Allegan, County of, Kellie Allen, Hope Anderson, Antrim, County of, Mary Balkema, Baraga, County of, Barry, County of, Nicholas Benson, Benzie, County of, Berrien, County of, Sally L. Brooks, Calhoun, County of, Melanie Camps, Lorna Carey, Cass, County of, Chippewa, County of, Judith A. Clark, Sherry A. Comben, Lori Cox, Delta, County of, Dickinson, County of, Eaton, County of, Emmet, County of, Carmen Fazzari, John Gallagher, III, Sherry Godfrey, Gogebic, County of, Jennifer Goudreau, Grand Traverse, County of, Tonia Hartline, Lisa Hewitt, Hillsdale, County of, Houghton, County of, Kathy Humphries, Ingham, County of, Ionia, County of, Iron, County of, Pamela Johnson, Kalamazoo, County of, Kalkaska, County of, Kent, County of, Andrew Kmeetz, IV, Anne Koski, Brenda Kutchinski, Stephenie Kyser, Lake, County of, Leelanau, County of, Lori Leudeman, Peter Macgregor, Mackinac, County of, Manistee, County of, Marquette, County of, Mason, County of, Lisa Mattila, Menominee, County of, Missaukee, County of, Mary Mitchell, Montcalm, County of, Holly Moon, Tony Moulatsiotis, Muskegon, County of, Rachel Nelson, Trisha Nesbitt, Newaygo, County of, Kristi Nottingham, Oceana, County of, Ontonagon, County of, Osceola, County of, Ottawa, County of, Barbara A. Parrett, Kenneth D. Parrish, Mary Lou Phillips, Jeanne Pollard, Amanda Price, Judith Ratering, Robert Robinson, Julie Roscioli, Heidi Scheppe, Eric Schertzing, Schoolcraft, County of, St. Joseph, County of, Michelle Thompson, Valerie Thornburg, Jill C. Tollefson, Van Buren, County of, Susan Vandercar, Joanne Vukin, Shelly Weich, Brian Wensauer, Wexford, County of, Thomas Whitener, Bret E. Witkowski (none provided) (eod)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (eod)
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Ray Kent indicating that this case is not related to case numbers 1:14-cv-1274 and 1:19-cv-501; Cases are cognate (jmw)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kerry Mark Properties, LLC (Visser, Donald)
January 20, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Ali Abdulmajeed Al-Faraj, Mindy Calkins, Kerry Mark Properties, LLC in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6219645 (Visser, Donald)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Plaintiffs filed by Ali Abdulmajeed Al-Faraj, Mindy Calkins, Kerry Mark Properties, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Visser, Donald) Modified text on 1/27/2021 (eod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calkins et al v. Kent, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Goudreau
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muskegon, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsdale, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iron, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ionia, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally L. Brooks
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Buren, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Kmeetz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Koski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry A. Comben
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent, County of
Represented By: Matthew T. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalkaska, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellie Allen
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Vukin
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manistee, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Camps
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Nottingham
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonia Hartline
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill C. Tollefson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Weich
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Peter Macgregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalamazoo, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasurer Trisha Nesbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegan, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Johnson
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Thompson
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Schertzing
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calhoun, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baraga, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Balkema
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berrien, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Ratering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorna Carey
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret E. Witkowski
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ontonagon, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel nelson
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cass, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ottawa, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oceana, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Traverse, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Vandercar
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montcalm, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Wensauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missaukee, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chippewa, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Thornburg
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Kenneth D. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Scheppe
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Hewitt
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gallagher, III
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Moon
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mackinac, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newaygo, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alger, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Roscioli
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope Anderson
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmet, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houghton, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Whitener
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Mattila
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gogebic, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Benson
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Mitchell
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antrim, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benzie, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lou Phillips
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephenie Kyser
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara A. Parrett
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Fazzari
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Moulatsiotis
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Cox
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osceola, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith A. Clark
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Godfrey
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dickinson, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingham, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Leademan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Kutchinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schoolcraft, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leelanau, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Robinson
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Humphries
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menominee, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith L. Ratering
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Macgregor
Represented By: Matthew T. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Leudeman
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian W. Wensauer
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth D. Parrish
Represented By: Matthew T. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew R. Kmeetz, IV
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne M. Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne T. Koski
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trisha Nesbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda L. Kutchinski
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Mindy Calkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Mark Properties, LLC
Represented By: Shawn E. Gillum
Represented By: Donald R. Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Ali Abdulmajeed Al-Faraj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Al-Faraj
Represented By: Shawn E. Gillum
Represented By: Donald R. Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mindy Calkins
Represented By: Shawn E. Gillum
Represented By: Donald R. Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?