UnitedHealth Group Incorporated v. Lexington Insurance Company et al
Case Number: |
0:2005cv01289 |
Filed: |
June 29, 2005 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Minnesota |
Presiding Judge: |
Jeanne J. Graham |
Presiding Judge: |
Patrick J. Schiltz |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 25, 2014 |
Filing
1534
ORDER granting 1506 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The motion of defendants Executive Risk Specialty Insurance Company, First Specialty Insurance Corporation, and Starr Excess Liability Insurance International Limit ed for summary judgment on Counts V and VI of the second amended supplemental complaint 1506 is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiff shall take nothing from defendants Executive Risk Specialty Insurance Company, First Specialty Insurance Corporation, or Starr Excess Liability Insurance International Limited on Counts V and VI of the second amended supplemental complaint 556 . (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on September 25, 2014. (CLG)
|
April 25, 2013 |
Filing
1378
ORDER granting 1330 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 1331 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 1341 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 1348 Motion for Summary Judgment. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 04/25/13. (bjs)
|
December 27, 2011 |
Filing
1015
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. United's motion for summary judgment on the insuring agreements in the Lexington policy [Docket No. 879 ] is GRANTED IN PART as more fully described in the text of this opinion. 2. D efendants' cross-motion for summary judgment on the insuring agreements in the Lexington policy [Docket No. 906 ] is DENIED. 3. Columbia and FFIC's motion for summary judgment on interrelatedness [Docket No. 865 ] is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. a. The motion is GRANTED with respect to Columbia and FFIC's argument that the McRaney/Murphy and Florida Physicians claims are interrelated with the Shane claim within the meaning of § 5.2 of the Lexington policy. b. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. 4. FFIC's motion for summary judgment as to United's second and third affirmative defenses of waiver and estoppel [Docket No. 872 ] is DENIED. 5. United's motion for partial summary judgment against FFIC [Docket No. 883 ] isDENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 12/27/11. (sf)
|
January 19, 2010 |
Filing
460
ORDER - Based on the foregoing, and on all of the files, records, and proceedings herein, the Court ADOPTS IN PART Special Master Reports 4 and 4A [Docket Nos. 266, 377], as more fully set forth in the text of this opinion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT : Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment 214 is DENIED. Defendant Columbia Casualty Company's motion to continue summary-judgment briefing 218 is DENIED AS MOOT. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 01/19/10. (bjs)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?