Fair Isaac Corporation v. Equifax Inc.
Case Number: |
0:2006cv04112 |
Filed: |
October 11, 2006 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Minnesota |
Presiding Judge: |
Unassigned |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 21, 2010 |
Filing
1076
ORDER granting in part 1057 Experian's Motion for Taxation of Costs; denying 1075 Experian's Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 05/21/2010. (TLU)
|
May 10, 2010 |
Filing
1067
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 986 Fair Isaac's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, a New Trial, or Detailed Findings; granting 983 Defendants' Motion to Amend the Judgment to order Cancellation of Trademark Registration; gran ting in part and denying in part 976 Trans Union's Motion for Attorneys' Fees; denying 978 Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees; denying as moot 1046 Defendants' Motion to Strike. The Judgment 970 is AMENDED; the Un ited States Patent and Trademark Office is ordered to cancel U.S. Trademark Registration No. 3,083,563; and the order to cancel U.S. Trademark Registration No. 3,083,563 is stayed pending any appeal of this matter (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 05/10/2010. (TLU)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing
969
ORDER finding in favor of Experian and Trans Union on Fair Isaac's keyword advertising claims; finding in favor of Defendants on Fair Isaac's passing off claims; and finding Fair Isaacs failure to establish liability forecloses injunctive relief from VantageScore (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/25/2009. (TLU)
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing
861
ORDER denying 726 Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Third Party Statements; denying 754 Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Arguments Relating to Trademark Validity (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/23/2009. (TLU)
|
July 24, 2009 |
Filing
694
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 572 Trans Union's Motion to Bifurcate; granting 575 Trans Union and VantageScore Solutions' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 579 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 585 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 594 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 659 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 07/24/09. (JEK)
|
January 22, 2009 |
Filing
566
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OVERRULING 437 Defendants' Objections To Discovery Ruling filed by VantageScore Solutions, LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc., Trans Union, LLC (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 01/22/2009. (TLU)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?