Timebase Pty Ltd v. Thomson Corporation, The Featured Case

Plaintiff Timebase Pty Ltd. sued defendant The Thomson Corporation for infringing U.S. Patent No. 6,233,592 entitled "System for electronic publishing."

Plaintiff: Timebase Pty Ltd
Defendant: Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation and West Services Inc.
Case Number: 0:2007cv01687
Filed: March 28, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joan N. Ericksen
Presiding Judge: Jeanne J. Graham
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2011 Filing 297 Federal Circuit Case Number 2012-1082 for 293 Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (JME)
November 28, 2011 Filing 296 NOTICE re 293 Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit. Appeal received at Federal Circuit on 11/23/11. (RLR)
November 17, 2011 Filing 295 RECEIPT number 4060223 in the amount of $445.00 issued to Niro Haller Niro. (RLR) QC'D by CLW on 11/18/2011.
November 14, 2011 Filing 294 TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT Re: Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit 293 . Documents sent to Federal Circuit conventionally. (jz)
November 4, 2011 Filing 293 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hosteny, Joseph)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER : On October 7, 2011, the Court granted Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment for the reasons set forth in a sealed Memorandum. Having received no proposed redactions, the Court unseals the Memorandum [Docket No. 288].IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on October 19, 2011. (slf)
October 14, 2011 Filing 291 TimeBase's Statement Regarding Proposed Redactions To The Memorandum of October 7, 2011 and Certificate of Service by Timebase Pty Ltd (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text on 10/17/2011 (jz).
October 7, 2011 Filing 290 JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice, # 2 Civil Notice - appeal)(jam)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting 230 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 243 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; denying 244 Motion for Summary Judgment. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 10/7/11. (jam) Modified on 10/12/2011 QC'd by CLW.
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 288 UNSEALED PER 292 ORDER: MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (jam) (kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 10/25/11. (KT)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER denying 273 Motion. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on September 27, 2011. (slf)
September 9, 2011 Filing 286 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service for Proposed Order)(Razavi, Katherine)
September 7, 2011 Filing 285 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Timebase Pty Ltd . (Hosteny, Joseph)
August 26, 2011 Filing 284 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 08/11/11 before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (63 pages). Court Reporter: Maria Weinbeck (E-mail: Maria_Weinbeck@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5109). Redaction Request due 9/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/26/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (mw)
August 26, 2011 Filing 283 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (mw)
August 19, 2011 Filing 282 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
August 19, 2011 Filing 281 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 280 Declaration by Timebase Pty Ltd (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified link & text on 8/22/2011 (lph).
August 19, 2011 Filing 280 Declaration of Marcia Kowalski in Support of 275 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A (part 1), # 2 Exhibit(s) A (part 2))(Hosteny, Joseph)
August 18, 2011 Filing 279 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
August 18, 2011 Filing 278 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Litsey, Calvin)
August 18, 2011 Filing 277 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: 273 Motion to Clarify the Claim Construction as it relates to Summanry Judgment, 274 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 275 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 276 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate by Timebase Pty Ltd (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text on 8/19/2011 (jz).
August 18, 2011 Filing 276 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 275 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
August 18, 2011 Filing 275 MEMORANDUM in Support re 273 MOTION TimeBase's Motion To Clarify The Claim Construction As It Relates to Summary Judgment filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Filed in Error-Exhibit(s) A - part 1, # 2 Attachment Filed in Error-Exhibit(s) A - part 2)(Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text on 8/19/2011 (jz).
August 18, 2011 Filing 274 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 273 MOTION TimeBase's Motion To Clarify The Claim Construction As It Relates to Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Hosteny, Joseph)
August 18, 2011 Filing 273 MOTION TimeBase's Motion To Clarify The Claim Construction As It Relates to Summary Judgment by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
August 11, 2011 Filing 272 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan N. Ericksen: Motion Hearing held on 8/11/2011 re 244 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of No Invalidity filed by Timebase Pty Ltd, 243 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony corrected filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services, 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. Motions argued and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck) (slf)
July 28, 2011 Filing 271 REPLY re 243 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony corrected filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wagner, Kevin)
July 28, 2011 Filing 270 REPLY re 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wagner, Kevin) Modified text on 7/29/2011 (jz).
July 28, 2011 Filing 269 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: 267 Reply, 268 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate by Timebase Pty Ltd (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text on 7/29/2011 (jz).
July 28, 2011 Filing 268 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 267 Reply filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 28, 2011 Filing 267 REPLY re 244 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of No Invalidity TimeBase's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of No Invalidity filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 22, 2011 Filing 266 Declaration of Michael Stonebraker in Support of 265 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-1, # 2 Exhibit(s) A-2, # 3 Exhibit(s) A-3, # 4 Exhibit(s) A-4, # 5 Exhibit(s) A-5, # 6 Exhibit(s) A-6, # 7 Exhibit(s) A-7, # 8 Exhibit(s) A-8)(Wagner, Kevin)
July 22, 2011 Filing 265 RESPONSE in Opposition re 244 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of No Invalidity filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wagner, Kevin)
July 21, 2011 Filing 264 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Timebase Pty Ltd re 243 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony corrected, 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 21, 2011 Filing 263 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 256 Declaration in Support, 258 Response, 259 Declaration in Support, Timebase's Certificate of Service of Sealed Documents (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 21, 2011 Filing 262 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 256 Declaration in Support, 258 Response, 261 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 255 Response, 257 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 260 Declaration in Support, 259 Declaration in Support, (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 21, 2011 Filing 261 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 258 Response filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 21, 2011 Filing 260 Declaration of Leonie Muldoon in Support of 258 Response filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Hosteny, Joseph)
July 21, 2011 Filing 259 Declaration of Jenna J. Bayer in Support of 258 Response filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibits F, G, H, J, K, N and Q, # 2 Exhibit(s) A (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit(s) A (Part 2), # 4 Exhibit(s) B, # 5 Exhibit(s) C (Part 1), # 6 Exhibit(s) C (Part 2), # 7 Exhibit(s) D, # 8 Exhibit(s) E, # 9 Exhibit(s) I, # 10 Exhibit(s) L, # 11 Exhibit(s) M, # 12 Exhibit(s) O, # 13 Exhibit(s) P)(Hosteny, Joseph)
July 21, 2011 Filing 258 RESPONSE re 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment Placeholder for Timebase's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 21, 2011 Filing 257 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 255 Response,. (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 21, 2011 Filing 256 Declaration of Jenna J. Bayer in Support of 255 Response, filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit(s) A (Part 2), # 3 Placeholder for Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit(s) C)(Hosteny, Joseph)
July 21, 2011 Filing 255 RESPONSE re 237 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 243 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony corrected Timebase's Response to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Ophir Frieder filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 14, 2011 Filing 254 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy M Sullivan on behalf of Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Sullivan, Timothy)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER re 251 Stipulation filed by Timebase Pty Ltd, Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on July 13, 2011. (slf)
July 12, 2011 Filing 252 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services re 251 Stipulation (Wagner, Kevin)
July 12, 2011 Filing 251 STIPULATION Regarding Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by Thomson Corporation, The, Timebase Pty Ltd, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Wagner, Kevin)
July 1, 2011 Filing 250 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timebase Pty Ltd Of Sealed Exhibit (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 1, 2011 Filing 249 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: 244 Motion for Summary Judgment, 245 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 246 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 247 Declaration, 248 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate by Timebase Pty Ltd (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text on 7/5/2011 (jz).
July 1, 2011 Filing 248 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 246 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 1, 2011 Filing 247 Declaration of Jenna J. Bayer in Support of 246 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) A - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) B, # 4 Exhibit(s) C, # 5 Exhibit(s) D - Part 1, # 6 Exhibit(s) D - Part 2, # 7 Placeholder for Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit(s) F, # 9 Exhibit(s) G, # 10 Exhibit(s) H, # 11 Exhibit(s) I, # 12 Exhibit(s) J, # 13 Exhibit(s) K, # 14 Exhibit(s) L, # 15 Appendix A, # 16 Appendix B, # 17 Appendix C, # 18 Appendix D - Part 1, # 19 Appendix D - Part 2, # 20 Appendix D - Part 3, # 21 Appendix E - Part 1, # 22 Appendix E - Part 2, # 23 Appendix F - Part 1, # 24 Appendix F - Part 2, # 25 Appendix F - Part 3, # 26 Appendix F - Part 4, # 27 Appendix F - Part 5, # 28 Appendix F - Part 6, # 29 Appendix F - Part 7, # 30 Appendix F - Part 8, # 31 Appendix F - Part 9, # 32 Appendix F - Part 10, # 33 Appendix F - Part 11, # 34 Appendix F - Part 12, # 35 Appendix F - Part 13, # 36 Appendix F - Part 14, # 37 Appendix F - Part 15, # 38 Appendix F - Part 16, # 39 Appendix G - Part 1, # 40 Appendix G - Part 2)(Hosteny, Joseph)
July 1, 2011 Filing 246 MEMORANDUM in Support re 244 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of No Invalidity filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 1, 2011 Filing 245 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 244 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of No Invalidity : Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 1, 2011 Filing 244 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of No Invalidity by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 1, 2011 Filing 243 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony corrected by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Wagner, Kevin)
June 30, 2011 Filing 242 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services re 237 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 238 Declaration in Support, (Wagner, Kevin)
June 30, 2011 Filing 241 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services re 234 Declaration in Support, 233 Declaration in Support,, 232 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Wagner, Kevin)
June 30, 2011 Filing 240 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services re 237 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Litsey, Calvin)
June 30, 2011 Filing 239 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services re 232 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Wagner, Kevin)
June 30, 2011 Filing 238 Declaration of Mary V. Sooter in Support of 237 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibit 1, # 2 Placeholder for Exhibit 2, # 3 Placeholder for Exhibit 3, # 4 Placeholder for Exhibit 4, # 5 Placeholder for Exhibit 5) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 7/1/11. (Litsey, Calvin) Modified on 7/7/2011 (akl).
June 30, 2011 Filing 237 MEMORANDUM in Support re 243 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Ophir Frieder Filed Under Seal filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 7/1/11. (Litsey, Calvin) Modified text on 7/1/2011 (jz). Modified on 7/7/2011 (akl).
June 30, 2011 Filing 236 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 243 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Ophir Frieder : Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Litsey, Calvin) Modified text on 7/1/2011 (jz).
June 30, 2011 Filing 235 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Ophir Frieder by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Litsey, Calvin) Modified text on 7/1/2011 (jz).
June 30, 2011 Filing 234 Declaration of Michael Stonebraker in Support of 232 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Ex. A) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 7/1/11. (Wagner, Kevin) Modified on 7/7/2011 (akl).
June 30, 2011 Filing 233 Declaration of Mary V. Sooter in Support of 232 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Ex. 1, # 2 Placeholder for Ex. 2, # 3 Placeholder for Ex. 3, # 4 Placeholder for Ex. 4, # 5 Placeholder for Ex. 5, # 6 Placeholder for Ex. 6, # 7 Placeholder for Ex. 7, # 8 Exhibit(s) 8, # 9 Exhibit(s) 8, # 10 Placeholder for Ex. 9, # 11 Exhibit(s) 10, # 12 Exhibit(s) 11, # 13 Exhibit(s) 12) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 7/1/11. (Wagner, Kevin) Modified on 7/7/2011 (akl).
June 30, 2011 Filing 232 MEMORANDUM in Support re 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed under seal filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 7/1/11. (Wagner, Kevin) Modified on 7/7/2011 (akl).
June 30, 2011 Filing 231 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Wagner, Kevin) Modified text on 7/1/2011 (jz).
June 30, 2011 Filing 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Wagner, Kevin)
June 23, 2011 Filing 229 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mary V Sooter (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sooter, Mary)
April 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 228 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions (disp) due by 7/1/2011. Ready for trial due by 9/16/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 4/27/11. (RLR)
April 26, 2011 Filing 227 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services re 226 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend the Pretrial Schedule by Thirty Days (Wagner, Kevin)
April 25, 2011 Filing 226 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend the Pretrial Schedule by Thirty Days by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Wagner, Kevin)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 225 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/20/2011. Motions (non-disp) due 5/20/2011. Motions (disp) due by 6/1/2011. Ready for trial due by 8/16/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 2/1/11. (RLR)
January 31, 2011 Filing 224 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Timebase Pty Ltd [redacted]. (Hosteny, Joseph)
January 31, 2011 Filing 223 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Litsey, Calvin)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER re: The parties may e-file more detailed position statements, not to exceed three pages by end of day, Monday, January 31, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 1/26/11. (RLR)
January 25, 2011 Filing 221 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Motion, # 2 Order)(Hosteny, Joseph)
January 25, 2011 Filing 220 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Litsey, Calvin)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MARKMAN ORDER (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on January 21, 2011. (slf)
January 6, 2011 Filing 218 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE in response to 217 LETTER by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified on 1/6/2011 (kt).
January 6, 2011 Filing 217 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE requesting to postpone deadlines by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Litsey, Calvin) Modified on 1/6/2011 (kt).
December 22, 2010 Filing 216 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin P Wagner (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wagner, Kevin)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER denying 168 Motion ; granting in part and denying in part 177 Motion to Compel; granting 192 Motion for Protective Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs Motion Regarding Protective Order (Doc. No. 168) is DENIED, and Plaintiff is ordered to immediately cease using the disputed document and destroy or return all copies in its possession. 2. Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Adequate Discovery Regarding Damages (Doc. No. 177) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth fully herein. 3. Defendants Motion for Protective Order (Doc. No. 192) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 10/26/2010. (LMB)
October 25, 2010 Filing 214 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: Motion Hearing held on 10/25/2010 re 168 MOTION Regarding The Protective Order filed by Timebase Pty Ltd, 192 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. The motions were taken under advismenet and a written order will be issued. (RLR)
October 22, 2010 Filing 213 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services re 212 Claim Construction Brief Supplemental (Wagner, Kevin)
October 22, 2010 Filing 212 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF Supplemental filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wagner, Kevin)
October 19, 2010 Filing 211 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: Motion Hearing held on 10/19/2010 re 177 MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Regarding Damages filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. Motion taken under advisement, written order to be issued. (RLR)
October 18, 2010 Filing 210 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services re 207 Response in Opposition to Motion, 208 Declaration, 209 Declaration. (Razavi, Katherine) Modified text and link on 10/19/2010 (jz).
October 18, 2010 Filing 209 Declaration of Katherine S. Razavi in Support of 207 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G)(Razavi, Katherine) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/18/10. (KT)
October 18, 2010 Filing 208 Declaration of Mark Stignani in Support of 207 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Razavi, Katherine) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/18/10. (KT)
October 18, 2010 Filing 207 RESPONSE in Opposition re 168 MOTION Regarding The Protective Order filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Razavi, Katherine) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/18/10. (KT)
October 18, 2010 Filing 206 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: 203 Response, 204 Declaration, 205 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate by Timebase Pty Ltd (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text and link on 10/19/2010 (jz).
October 18, 2010 Filing 205 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 203 Response filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
October 18, 2010 Filing 204 Declaration of Jenna Bayer in Support of 203 Response filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibits A and B, # 2 Exhibit(s) C, # 3 Exhibit(s) D, # 4 Exhibit(s) E)(Hosteny, Joseph)SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE on 10/19/2010 (lph).
October 18, 2010 Filing 203 RESPONSE re 192 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Mark Stignani [Filed Under Seal] filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE on 10/19/2010 (lph).
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting 185 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on October 15, 2010. (slf)
October 12, 2010 Filing 201 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services re 198 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 200 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 199 Declaration in Support (Wagner, Kevin)
October 12, 2010 Filing 200 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services re 198 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Wagner, Kevin)
October 12, 2010 Filing 199 Declaration of Kevin P. Wagner in Support of 198 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibits A-Y)(Wagner, Kevin) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERk'S OFFICE ON 10/12/10. (KT)
October 12, 2010 Filing 198 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 177 MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Regarding Damages filed under seal filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Wagner, Kevin) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERk'S OFFICE ON 10/12/10. (KT)
October 11, 2010 Filing 197 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services re 193 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 195 Declaration in Support, 194 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 192 MOTION for Protective Order, 196 Declaration in Support, (Razavi, Katherine)
October 11, 2010 Filing 196 Declaration of Lauren Frank in Support of 194 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Placeholder for Exhibit I, # 10 Placeholder for Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit(s) K)(Razavi, Katherine) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERk'S OFFICE ON 10/12/10. (KT)
October 11, 2010 Filing 195 Declaration of Mark Stignani in Support of 194 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Razavi, Katherine)
October 11, 2010 Filing 194 MEMORANDUM in Support re 192 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Razavi, Katherine)
October 11, 2010 Filing 193 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 192 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Razavi, Katherine)
October 11, 2010 Filing 192 MOTION for Protective Order by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Razavi, Katherine)
October 8, 2010 Filing 191 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Litsey, Calvin)
October 6, 2010 Filing 190 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: 185 Motion for Leve to File TimeBase's Supplemental Claim Construction Memorandum, 186 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 187 Declaration in Support of Motion, 188 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 189 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate by Timebase Pty Ltd (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text and link on 10/7/2010 (jz).
October 6, 2010 Filing 189 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 186 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
October 6, 2010 Filing 188 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 185 Motion for Leave to File. Date and time to be determined. (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text and link on 10/7/2010 (jz).
October 6, 2010 Filing 187 Declaration of Jenna J. Bayer in Support of 186 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B)(Hosteny, Joseph)
October 6, 2010 Filing 186 MEMORANDUM in Support and Certificate of Service re 185 MOTION for Leave to File TimeBase's Supplemental Claim Construction Memorandum filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text on 10/7/2010 (jz).
October 6, 2010 Filing 185 MOTION for Leave to File TimeBase's Supplemental Claim Construction Memorandum by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
October 5, 2010 Filing 184 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: 177 Motion to Compel, 178 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 179 Declaration in Support of Motion, 180 Declaration in Support of Motion, 181 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 182 Certificate of Compliance with LR 37.1, 183 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate by Timebase Pty Ltd (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text and link on 10/6/2010 (jz).
October 5, 2010 Filing 183 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 178 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
October 5, 2010 Filing 182 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH LR 37.1 re: 177 MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Regarding Damages filed by Timebase Pty Ltd by Timebase Pty Ltd filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
October 5, 2010 Filing 181 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 177 MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Regarding Damages : Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Hosteny, Joseph)
October 5, 2010 Filing 180 Declaration of Alison McCarthy in Support of 178 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 10/6/10. (RLR)
October 5, 2010 Filing 179 Declaration of Jenna J. Bayer in Support of 178 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibits A-N)(Hosteny, Joseph) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 10/6/10. (RLR)
October 5, 2010 Filing 178 MEMORANDUM in Support re 177 MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Regarding Damages [Filed Under Seal] filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 10/6/10. (RLR)
October 5, 2010 Filing 177 MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Regarding Damages by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
October 4, 2010 Filing 176 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 09/23/10 before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (113 pages). Court Reporter: Maria Weinbeck (E-mail: Maria_Weinbeck@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5109). Redaction Request due 10/25/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (mw)
October 4, 2010 Filing 175 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (mw)
September 30, 2010 Filing 174 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 168 MOTION Regarding The Protective Order, 170 Declaration in Support, 169 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 173 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 172 Certificate of Compliance with LR 37.1, 171 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (Hosteny, Joseph)
September 30, 2010 Filing 173 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 169 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Hosteny, Joseph)
September 30, 2010 Filing 172 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH LR 37.1 re 168 MOTION Regarding The Protective Order filed by Timebase Pty Ltd by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
September 30, 2010 Filing 171 NOTICE OF HEARING ON 168 MOTION: Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text and link on 10/1/2010 (lmb).
September 30, 2010 Filing 170 DECLARATION of Jenna J. Bayer in Support of 169 Memorandum in Support of 168 Motion filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibits A-J). (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text and link on 10/1/2010 (lmb). SEALED DOCUMENTS FILED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/30/10. (RLR)
September 30, 2010 Filing 169 MEMORANDUM in Support re 168 MOTION Regarding The Protective Order [Filed Under Seal] filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text on 10/1/2010 (lmb). SEALED DOCUMENT FILED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/30/10. (RLR)
September 30, 2010 Filing 168 MOTION Regarding The Protective Order 72 by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified link on 10/1/2010 (lmb).
September 23, 2010 Filing 167 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan N. Ericksen: Markman Hearing held on 9/23/2010. (Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck) (slf)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/29/2010. Motions (non-disp) due 11/15/2010.All other deadlines remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 8/2/10. (RLR)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER re 162 Stipulation regarding certain depositions filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 8/2/10. (RLR)
July 20, 2010 Filing 164 Joint MOTION for Order to Modify the Second Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Razavi, Katherine)
July 20, 2010 Filing 163 NOTICE OF MOTION re: 164 Joint Motion for Modification of the Second Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services, Timebase Pty Ltd. (Razavi, Katherine) Modified text and link on 7/21/2010 (jz).
July 20, 2010 Filing 162 STIPULATION Regarding Certain Depositions by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services, Timebase Pty Ltd. (Razavi, Katherine) Modified text on 7/21/2010 (jz).
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER re: The Court will sign Defendants' requests, but take steps to alleviate Plaintiff's concerns. First, the Court will require all Australia depositions to be completed in one trip. Second, the Court will extend the deadline for fact discovery and non-dispositive motions relating to fact discovery to 10/15/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 7/20/10. (RLR)
July 14, 2010 Filing 160 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE re update on Letters Rogatory by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 Order from Australian Court, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Razavi, Katherine) Modified on 7/15/2010 (kt).
July 12, 2010 Filing 159 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Razavi, Katherine)
July 9, 2010 Filing 158 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 155 Response (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 9, 2010 Filing 157 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 155 Response filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 9, 2010 Filing 156 Declaration of Jenna J. Bayer in Support of 155 Response filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) N, # 2 Exhibit(s) O, # 3 Exhibit(s) P, # 4 Exhibit(s) Q)(Hosteny, Joseph)
July 9, 2010 Filing 155 RESPONSE re 142 Claim Construction Brief,,,,,,,,,,,, TIMEBASE'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION RESPONSE filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
July 9, 2010 Filing 154 RESPONSE re 142 Claim Construction Brief,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Razavi, Katherine)
July 6, 2010 Filing 153 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment-Status Regarding Depositions)(Hosteny, Joseph)
July 2, 2010 Filing 152 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on April 21, 2010 before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (36 pages). Transcriber: Lorilee Fink (E-mail: Lorilee_Fink@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5105). Redaction Request due 7/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2010. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (LKF)
July 2, 2010 Filing 151 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (LKF)
June 21, 2010 Filing 150 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Razavi, Katherine)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 147 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert A. Conley for Timebase Pty Ltd. Fee paid; receipt number 4-046266. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 6/18/10. (MMC)
June 18, 2010 Filing 149 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
June 17, 2010 Filing 148 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Hosteny, Joseph)
June 16, 2010 Filing 147 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Robert A. Conley by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Cunningham, Michael)
June 15, 2010 Filing 146 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 142 Claim Construction Brief filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text on 6/15/2010 (jz).
June 11, 2010 Filing 145 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 144 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 142 Claim Construction Brief, 143 Declaration in Support Kristin C. Maggio (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text on 6/14/2010 (jz).
June 11, 2010 Filing 144 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 142 Claim Construction Brief filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text on 6/14/2010 (jz).
June 11, 2010 Filing 143 Declaration of Kristin C. Maggio in Support of 142 Claim Construction Brief filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text on 6/14/2010 (jz).
June 11, 2010 Filing 142 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) B Part 1, # 4 Exhibit(s) B Part 2, # 5 Exhibit(s) B part 3, # 6 Exhibit(s) B Part 4, # 7 Exhibit(s) B Part 5, # 8 Exhibit(s) B Part 6, # 9 Exhibit(s) B Part 7, # 10 Exhibit(s) B part 8, # 11 Exhibit(s) C, # 12 Exhibit(s) D Part 1, # 13 Exhibit(s) D Part 2, # 14 Exhibit(s) D Part 3, # 15 Exhibit(s) D Part 4, # 16 Exhibit(s) D Part 5, # 17 Exhibit(s) D Part 6, # 18 Exhibit(s) D Part 7, # 19 Exhibit(s) D Part 8, # 20 Exhibit(s) D Part 9, # 21 Exhibit(s) D Part 10, # 22 Exhibit(s) D Part 11, # 23 Exhibit(s) D Part 12, # 24 Exhibit(s) D Part 13, # 25 Exhibit(s) D Part 14, # 26 Exhibit(s) D Part 15, # 27 Exhibit(s) D Part 16, # 28 Exhibit(s) D Part 17, # 29 Exhibit(s) D Part 18, # 30 Exhibit(s) D Part 19, # 31 Exhibit(s) D Part 20, # 32 Exhibit(s) D Part 21, # 33 Exhibit(s) D Part 22, # 34 Exhibit(s) D Part 23, # 35 Exhibit(s) D Part 24, # 36 Exhibit(s) D Part 25, # 37 Exhibit(s) D Part 26, # 38 Exhibit(s) D Part 27, # 39 Exhibit(s) D Part 28, # 40 Exhibit(s) D Part 29, # 41 Exhibit(s) D Part 30, # 42 Exhibit(s) D Part 31, # 43 Exhibit(s) D Part 32, # 44 Exhibit(s) D Part 33, # 45 Exhibit(s) D Part 34, # 46 Exhibit(s) D Part 35, # 47 Exhibit(s) D Part 36, # 48 Exhibit(s) D Part 37, # 49 Exhibit(s) D Part 38, # 50 Exhibit(s) D Part 39, # 51 Exhibit(s) D Part 40, # 52 Exhibit(s) D Part 41, # 53 Exhibit(s) D Part 42, # 54 Exhibit(s) D Part 43, # 55 Exhibit(s) D Part 44, # 56 Exhibit(s) D Part 45, # 57 Exhibit(s) D Part 46, # 58 Exhibit(s) D Part 47, # 59 Exhibit(s) D Part 48, # 60 Exhibit(s) D part 49, # 61 Exhibit(s) D Part 50, # 62 Exhibit(s) D Part 51, # 63 Exhibit(s) D Part 52, # 64 Exhibit(s) D Part 53, # 65 Exhibit(s) D Part 54, # 66 Exhibit(s) D Part 55, # 67 Exhibit(s) D Part 56, # 68 Exhibit(s) E Part 1, # 69 Exhibit(s) E Part 2, # 70 Exhibit(s) F Part 1, # 71 Exhibit(s) F Part 2, # 72 Exhibit(s) F Part 3, # 73 Exhibit(s) F Part 4, # 74 Exhibit(s) F Part 5, # 75 Exhibit(s) F Part 6, # 76 Exhibit(s) F Part 7, # 77 Exhibit(s) F Part 8, # 78 Exhibit(s) F Part 9, # 79 Exhibit(s) F Part 10, # 80 Exhibit(s) F Part 11, # 81 Exhibit(s) F Part 12, # 82 Exhibit(s) F Part 13, # 83 Exhibit(s) F Part 14, # 84 Exhibit(s) F Part 15, # 85 Exhibit(s) F Part 16, # 86 Exhibit(s) F Part 17, # 87 Exhibit(s) F Part 18, # 88 Exhibit(s) F Part 19, # 89 Exhibit(s) F Part 20, # 90 Exhibit(s) F Part 21, # 91 Exhibit(s) F part 22, # 92 Exhibit(s) F Part 23, # 93 Exhibit(s) F Part 24, # 94 Exhibit(s) F Part 25, # 95 Exhibit(s) F Part 26, # 96 Exhibit(s) F Part 27, # 97 Exhibit(s) F Part 28, # 98 Exhibit(s) F Part 29, # 99 Exhibit(s) F Part 30, # 100 Exhibit(s) F Part 31, # 101 Exhibit(s) F part 32, # 102 Exhibit(s) G, # 103 Exhibit(s) H, # 104 Exhibit(s) I, # 105 Exhibit(s) J, # 106 Exhibit(s) K, # 107 Exhibit(s) L, # 108 Exhibit(s) M)(Hosteny, Joseph)
June 11, 2010 Filing 141 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services re 139 Claim Construction Brief, 140 Declaration in Support. (Razavi, Katherine) Modified text on 6/14/2010 (jz).
June 11, 2010 Filing 140 Declaration of Katherine S. Razavi in Support of 139 Claim Construction Brief filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I, # 10 Exhibit(s) J, # 11 Exhibit(s) K, # 12 Exhibit(s) L, # 13 Exhibit(s) M, # 14 Exhibit(s) N, # 15 Exhibit(s) O, # 16 Exhibit(s) P, # 17 Exhibit(s) Q, # 18 Exhibit(s) R, # 19 Exhibit(s) S, # 20 Exhibit(s) T)(Razavi, Katherine)
June 11, 2010 Filing 139 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Razavi, Katherine)
May 14, 2010 Filing 138 NOTICE by Timebase Pty Ltd Joint Claim Construction Statement and Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text on 5/17/2010 (jz).
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying 124 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 5/3/10. (RLR)
April 21, 2010 Filing 136 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: Motion Hearing held on 4/21/2010 re 124 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 1 and 7 and Various Document Requests filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. The motion was taken under advisement, and an order will be issued. (RLR)
April 14, 2010 Filing 135 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services re 132 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 134 Declaration in Support,, 133 Declaration in Support (Wagner, Kevin)
April 14, 2010 Filing 134 Declaration of Kevin P. Wagner in Support of 132 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibit A, # 2 Placeholder for Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Placeholder for Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Placeholder for Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit(s) J, # 11 Placeholder for Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit(s) L Part 1, # 13 Exhibit(s) L Part 2, # 14 Exhibit(s) L Part 3, # 15 Exhibit(s) L Part 4, # 16 Exhibit(s) L Part 5, # 17 Exhibit(s) L Part 6)(Wagner, Kevin) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 4/14/10. (KT)
April 14, 2010 Filing 133 Declaration of Mark W. Hoffman in Support of 132 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Wagner, Kevin) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 4/14/10. (KT)
April 14, 2010 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 124 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 1 and 7 and Various Document Requests (filed under seal) filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wagner, Kevin) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 4/14/10. (KT)
March 19, 2010 Filing 131 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 124 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 1 and 7 and Various Document Requests : Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Hosteny, Joseph)
March 16, 2010 Filing 130 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 124 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 1 and 7 and Various Document Requests, 127 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 129 Certificate of Compliance with LR 37.1, 125 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text on 3/17/2010 (jz).
March 16, 2010 Filing 129 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH LR 37.1 re: 124 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 1 and 7 and Various Document Requests filed by Timebase Pty Ltd by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
March 16, 2010 Filing 128 Declaration of Joseph N. Hosteny in Support of 126 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibits A, C, E, F, G, H, I, J, K, L, M, U and V, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) D, # 4 Exhibit(s) N, # 5 Exhibit(s) O, # 6 Exhibit(s) P, # 7 Exhibit(s) Q, # 8 Exhibit(s) R, # 9 Exhibit(s) S, # 10 Exhibit(s) T, # 11 Exhibit(s) W, # 12 Exhibit(s) X)(Hosteny, Joseph) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 3/17/10. (KT)
March 16, 2010 Filing 127 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 126 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Hosteny, Joseph)
March 16, 2010 Filing 126 MEMORANDUM in Support re 124 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 1 and 7 and Various Document Requests filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 3/16/10. (KT)
March 16, 2010 Filing 125 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 124 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 1 and 7 and Various Document Requests : Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Hosteny, Joseph)
March 16, 2010 Filing 124 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 1 and 7 and Various Document Requests by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
February 17, 2010 Filing 123 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION re 116 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 1 and 8 [Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal Without Prejudice of Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 1 and 8) (Gasey, Arthur) Modified text on 2/18/2010 (jz).
February 11, 2010 Filing 122 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 116 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 1 and 8, 121 Certificate of Compliance with LR 37.1, 117 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 119 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate. (Gasey, Arthur) Modified text on 2/12/2010 (jz).
February 11, 2010 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH LR 37.1 re: 116 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 1 and 8 filed by Timebase Pty Ltd by Timebase Pty Ltd filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Gasey, Arthur)
February 11, 2010 Filing 120 Declaration of Arthur A. Gasey in Support of 118 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Placeholder for Exhibits B-M) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 2/12/10. (Gasey, Arthur) Modified on 2/12/2010 (akl).
February 11, 2010 Filing 119 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 118 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Gasey, Arthur)
February 11, 2010 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM in Support re 116 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 1 and 8 filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 2/12/10. (Gasey, Arthur) Modified on 2/12/2010 (akl).
February 11, 2010 Filing 117 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 116 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 1 and 8 : Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Gasey, Arthur)
February 11, 2010 Filing 116 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 1 and 8 by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Gasey, Arthur)
January 19, 2010 Filing 115 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR- MOTION for Hearing on Motion to Compel the Defendants to Provide Discovery Regarding Their Revenues and Their Intellectual Property by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text on 1/20/2010 (jz).
January 7, 2010 Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 11/25/2009 before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (49 pages). Transcriber: Jeanne Anderson (E-mail: Jeanne_Anderson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1221). Redaction Request due 1/28/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/7/2010. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (jma)
January 7, 2010 Filing 113 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (jma)
December 21, 2009 Filing 112 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second) by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Wagner, Kevin)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2009. Discovery due by 8/31/2010. Motions (non-disp) due 9/14/2010. Motions (disp) due by 2/4/2011. Ready for trial due by 6/1/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 12/7/09. (RLR)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 100 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 12/7/09. (RLR)
November 30, 2009 Filing 109 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc., filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I, # 10 Exhibit(s) J, # 11 Exhibit(s) K, # 12 Exhibit(s) L, # 13 Exhibit(s) M, # 14 Exhibit(s) N, # 15 Exhibit(s) O, # 16 Exhibit(s) P, # 17 Exhibit(s) Q) (Hosteny, Joseph)
November 25, 2009 Filing 108 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: Motion Hearing held on 11/25/2009 re 100 MOTION for Leave to File A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. Order to be issued. (akl)
November 18, 2009 Filing 107 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. re 105 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 106 Declaration in Support. (Budd, Theodore) Modified text on 11/19/2009 (jz).
November 18, 2009 Filing 106 Declaration of Darla Agard in Support of 105 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. (Budd, Theodore) Modified text on 11/19/2009 (jz).
November 18, 2009 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 100 MOTION for Leave to File A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Budd, Theodore) Modified text on 11/19/2009 (jz).
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2009. Discovery due by 6/30/2010. Motions (non-disp) due 7/14/2010. Motions (disp) due by 12/14/2010. Ready for trial due by 4/18/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 11/16/09. (RLR)
November 11, 2009 Filing 103 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 100 MOTION for Leave to File A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Hosteny, Joseph)
November 11, 2009 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM in Support re 100 MOTION for Leave to File A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
November 11, 2009 Filing 101 DECLARATION of JOSEPH N. HOSTENY re 100 MOTION for Leave to File A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A with Attachments, # 2 Exhibit(s) B)(Hosteny, Joseph)
November 11, 2009 Filing 100 MOTION for Leave to File A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
November 11, 2009 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. re 98 Joint MOTION to Extend Pretrial Schedule by Sixty Days. (Razavi, Katherine) Modified text on 11/12/2009 (jz).
November 11, 2009 Filing 98 Joint MOTION to Extend Pretrial Schedule by Sixty Days by Thomson Corporation, The, Timebase Pty Ltd, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. (Razavi, Katherine) Modified text on 11/12/2009 (jz).
November 6, 2009 Filing 97 NOTICE by Timebase Pty Ltd OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT (Hosteny, Joseph)
November 6, 2009 Filing 96 NOTICE by Timebase Pty Ltd OF MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Hosteny, Joseph)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 10/23/09. (RLR)
October 20, 2009 Filing 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: Motion Hearing held on 10/20/2009 re 83 MOTION to Compel Discovery from TimeBase filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. Motion taken under advisement. Order to be issued. (akl)
October 13, 2009 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 89 Response in Opposition to Motion TO COMPEL, 90 Declaration of Joseph N. Hosteny, 91 Declaration of Leonie Muldoon, 92 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate. (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified text on 10/14/2009 (jz).
October 13, 2009 Filing 92 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 89 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
October 13, 2009 Filing 91 Declaration of Leonie Muldoon in Support of 89 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
October 13, 2009 Filing 90 Declaration of Joseph N. Hosteny in Support of 89 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B - PART 1 OF 4, # 3 Exhibit(s) B - PART 2 OF 4, # 4 Exhibit(s) B - PART 3 OF 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) B - PART 4 OF 4, # 6 Exhibit(s) C, # 7 Exhibit(s) D)(Hosteny, Joseph)
October 13, 2009 Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re 83 MOTION to Compel Discovery from TimeBase filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
October 7, 2009 Filing 88 Corrected Declaration of Katherine S. Razavi in Support of 83 MOTION to Compel Discovery from TimeBase filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1-2, # 2 Exhibit(s) 3-5)(Razavi, Katherine)
October 6, 2009 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. re 83 MOTION to Compel Discovery from TimeBase, 84 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 85 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Razavi, Katherine) Modified text on 10/7/2009 (jz).
October 6, 2009 Filing 86 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: WILL REFILE. Declaration of Katherine S. Razavi in Support of 83 MOTION to Compel Discovery from TimeBase filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(Razavi, Katherine) Document sealed at request of counsel. Modified on 10/7/2009 (kt).
October 6, 2009 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM in Support re 83 MOTION to Compel Discovery from TimeBase filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Compliance with LR 37.1)(Razavi, Katherine)
October 6, 2009 Filing 84 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. re 83 MOTION to Compel Discovery from TimeBase. Motion hearing set for October 20, 2009, at 3:00 p.m., Courtroom 3B, 342 Federal Building, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Minnesota 55101 (Razavi, Katherine) Modified text and link on 10/7/2009 (jz).
October 6, 2009 Filing 83 MOTION to Compel Discovery from TimeBase by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc.. (Razavi, Katherine)
October 6, 2009 Filing 82 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL RE-FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. re 81 Certificate of Compliance with LR 37.1, 79 MOTION to Compel Discovery From Timebase, 80 Declaration in Support (Razavi, Katherine) Modified on 10/6/2009 (jam).
October 6, 2009 Filing 81 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH LR 37.1 re: 79 MOTION to Compel Discovery From Timebase filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc.. (Razavi, Katherine) Modified on 10/6/2009 (jam).
October 6, 2009 Filing 80 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL RE-FILE Declaration of Katherine S. Razavi in Support of 79 MOTION to Compel Discovery From Timebase filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(Razavi, Katherine) Modified on 10/6/2009 (jam). Exhibits sealed per request of counsel on 10/7/2009 (JME).
October 6, 2009 Filing 79 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL RE-FILE MOTION to Compel Discovery From Timebase by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. (Razavi, Katherine) Modified on 10/6/2009 (jam).
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER that Defendants must submit revised letters rogatory, complying with the instructions set forth herein, for the Courts signature by Tuesday, September 22, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 9/17/09. (JME)
September 14, 2009 Filing 77 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. (Razavi, Katherine) Modified text on 9/14/2009 (jz).
September 3, 2009 Filing 76 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Shawn T. Gordon (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Razavi, Katherine)
September 1, 2009 Filing 75 LETTER from Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham regarding the Letters Rogatory submitted by the defendants. The parties must meet and confer by September 10, 2009 to resolve the differences between the parties. Once the parties have reached an agreement, the Letters Rogatory may be re-submitted for consideration no later than September 14, 2009. If discreet issues (less in number and more defined than presently submitted) remain to be resolved, the parties may submit position statements no longer than two (2) pages. I will then review those submissions and decide how the issue(s) will be handled. (NES)
August 5, 2009 Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT of Rule 16 Discovery Conference held on July 8, 2009 before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (39 pages). Court Reporter: Lisa Thorsgaard (E-mail: lthorsgaard@gmail.com. Telephone: 651-681-8550). Redaction Request due 8/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (jz)
August 5, 2009 Filing 73 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (jz)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 70 Stipulation filed by Timebase Pty Ltd, The Thomson Corporation, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 07/20/2009. (NES)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2009. Discovery due by 5/1/2010. Motions (non-disp) due 5/15/2010. Motions (disp) due by 10/15/2010. Ready for trial due by 2/15/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 07/15/2009. (NES)
July 16, 2009 Filing 70 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Timebase Pty Ltd, Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Litsey, Calvin) Modified punctuation on 7/21/2009 (MMP).
July 8, 2009 Filing 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: RULE 16 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held on 7/8/2009. (NES)
July 1, 2009 Filing 68 REPORT 26(f) by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C-1, # 4 Exhibit(s) C-2, # 5 Exhibit(s) D)(Hosteny, Joseph) Modified filers on 7/6/2009 (jz).
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER that all filings and proceedings in these matters shall proceed solely with Civil No. 07-1687 (JNE/JJG) as the caption, and Civil No. 07-4551 (JNE/JJG), the consolidated case, shall no longer be listed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 6/4/09. (RLR)
June 4, 2009 Filing 66 AMENDED NOTICE of Pretrial Conference: Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2009 09:30 AM in Room 342, Warren E.Burger Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 316 North Robert Street, Saint Paul before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(LPH)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 6/4/09. (LPH)
May 26, 2009 Filing 64 STIPULATION re 62 Order Staying Case, by Timebase Pty Ltd, Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. (Cunningham, Michael) Modified punctuation on 5/27/2009 (jz).
December 5, 2008 Filing 63 STATUS REPORT by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Arthur A. Gasey)(Gasey, Arthur)
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER STAYING CASE. IT IS ORDERED THAT:1.Civil No. 07-1687 and Civil No. 07-4551 are CONSOLIDATED.2.Civil No. 07-1687 and Civil No. 07-4551 are STAYED pending the reexamination of the 592 Patent.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on May 6, 2008. (slf)
April 25, 2008 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. re 59 Brief, 60 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate (Gordon, Shawn)
April 25, 2008 Filing 60 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. re 59 Brief,. (Gordon, Shawn)
April 25, 2008 Filing 59 BRIEF (Supplemental) Addressing Issues Related to the Reconsideration of the Orders Denying a Stay of the '228 Case (NO. 07-4551) and Lifting the Stay of the '592 Case (NO. 07-1687). (Attachments: # 1 Index to Exhibits, # 2Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Gordon, Shawn) Modified on 4/28/2008 (jz).
April 24, 2008 Filing 58 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. of Thomson Reuters Corporation and Thomson Reuters PLC as corporate parent and/or publicly held company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gordon, Shawn)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re 56 Letter to District Judge filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on April 18. 2008. (slf)
April 17, 2008 Filing 56 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
April 3, 2008 Filing 55 CANCELLATION OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE The Pretrial Conference scheduled for Friday, April 11, 2008 has been cancelled. The conference will be rescheduled after the ruling on defendants' appeal of this Court's order lifting the stay in Case No. 07-CV-1687 (JNE/JJG) and consolidating these cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 4/3/08. (JMH)
March 5, 2008 Filing 54 NOTICE OF ( Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2008 10:30 AM, in Room 750, 180 East 5th Street, St. Paul, before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 3/5/08. (RJL)
February 13, 2008 Filing 52 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Thomson Corporation, The (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wright, Elizabeth)
February 12, 2008 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/28/2007 before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J Graham. Court Reporter: Leslie Pingley. (11pgs) FILED CONVENTIONALLY (jdf)
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER LIFTING STAY re: This case is CONSOLIDATED with Civil No. 07-4551 JNE/JJG. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 2/7/08. (RJL)
January 10, 2008 Filing 50 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Enclosure/Exhibit)(Wright, Elizabeth)
January 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re 45 that future status reports submitted by each party shall contain detailed explanations of the exact steps that have been taken and those steps yet to be completed in the examination process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 1/9/08. (SEA)
December 27, 2007 Filing 48 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Thomson Corporation, The. (Wright, Elizabeth)
December 27, 2007 Filing 47 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Hosteny, Joseph)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER that 07cv4551 was reassigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen and Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 11/27/07 and Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/28/07. (JME)
June 29, 2007 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham : Motion Hearing held on 6/29/2007 re 33 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination Proceedings filed by Thomson Corporation, The, is GRANTED. The parties were ordered to file status report letters every six months during the pendency of the stay. No order to be issued. (Tape #52 (510-1906)) (RJL) Modified on 7/2/2007 (jc).
June 21, 2007 Filing 44 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Timebase Pty Ltd, Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) E-Discovery Protocol# 2 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Proposed Protective Order# 3 Exhibit(s) Defendants' Proposed Protective Order)(Gasey, Arthur)
June 21, 2007 Filing 43 RESPONSE re 33 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination Proceedings filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A# 2 Exhibit(s) B# 3 Exhibit(s) C# 4 Exhibit(s) D# 5 Exhibit(s) E# 6 Exhibit(s) F# 7 Exhibit(s) G# 8 Exhibit(s) H# 9 Exhibit(s) I# 10 Exhibit(s) J)(Gasey, Arthur)
June 19, 2007 Filing 42 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services Inc. of Thomson Legal & Regulatory, Inc. as corporate parent and/or publicly held company of West Publishing Corporation and West Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Drown, Chad)
June 19, 2007 Filing 41 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL FROM CASE by Thomson Corporation, The (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Drown, Chad)
June 18, 2007 Filing 40 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by West Publishing Corporation, West Services, Inc., and by Thomson Corporation, The. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Drown, Chad)
June 18, 2007 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 38 Amended Complaint (Cunningham, Michael)
June 18, 2007 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Thomson Corporation, The, filed by Timebase Pty Ltd.(Cunningham, Michael)
June 14, 2007 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The re 35 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 36 Declaration in Support,, 34 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 33 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination Proceedings (Drown, Chad)
June 14, 2007 Filing 36 Declaration of Chad Drown in Support of 35 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 33 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination Proceedings filed by Thomson Corporation, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1# 2 Exhibit(s) 2# 3 Exhibit(s) 3 part I# 4 Exhibit(s) 3 part II# 5 Exhibit(s) 4# 6 Exhibit(s) 5# 7 Exhibit(s) 6# 8 Exhibit(s) 7# 9 Exhibit(s) 8# 10 Exhibit(s) 9)(Drown, Chad)
June 14, 2007 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support re 33 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination Proceedings filed by Thomson Corporation, The. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Drown, Chad)
June 14, 2007 Filing 34 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 33 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination Proceedings: Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2007 11:00 AM in St Paul - Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Drown, Chad)
June 14, 2007 Filing 33 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination Proceedings by Thomson Corporation, The. (Drown, Chad)
June 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re 29 Stipulation filed by Thomson Corporation, The,, Timebase Pty Ltd, . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 6/6/07. (RJL)
June 6, 2007 Filing 31 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Thomson Corporation, The Withdrawing Motion for More Definite Statement. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Drown, Chad)
June 5, 2007 Filing 30 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Cunningham, Michael)
June 1, 2007 Filing 29 STIPULATION to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Timebase Pty Ltd., The Thomson Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Cunningham, Michael) Modified on 6/4/2007 (jc).
May 23, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY granting 26 Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph N Hosteny for Timebase Pty Ltd. Fee paid; receipt number 4013349. Approved by Clerk Richard D Sletten on 5/22/07. (LLJ)
May 23, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY granting 27 Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Arthur A Gasey for Timebase Pty Ltd. Fee paid; receipt number 4013349. Approved by Clerk Richard D Sletten on 5/22/07. (LLJ)
May 21, 2007 Filing 28 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2007 11:00 AM in St Paul - Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (RJL)
May 21, 2007 Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Arthur A. Gasey by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Cunningham, Michael)
May 21, 2007 Filing 26 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Joseph N. Hosteny by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Cunningham, Michael)
May 10, 2007 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timebase Pty Ltd re 21 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve Amended Complaint, 24 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 23 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 20 Notice (Other), 22 Exhibit (Cunningham, Michael)
May 10, 2007 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re 21 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve Amended Complaint (Certificate of Compliance with District Court LR 7.1 attached) filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Cunningham, Michael)
May 10, 2007 Filing 23 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 21 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve Amended Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2007 11:00 AM in St Paul - Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Cunningham, Michael)
May 10, 2007 Filing 22 EXHIBIT re 21 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve Amended Complaint Exhibit A by Timebase Pty Ltd filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Cunningham, Michael)
May 10, 2007 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File and Serve Amended Complaint by Timebase Pty Ltd. (Cunningham, Michael)
May 10, 2007 Filing 20 NOTICE by Timebase Pty Ltd Association of Counsel (Cunningham, Michael)
March 28, 2007 Filing 19 Case transferred in from Northern District of Illinois; Case Number 1:07-cv-460. Original file with document 1 the Complaint, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received., filed by Timebase Pty Ltd. Case Assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Patent list and referred to Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Attachments: # 1 Docket Sheet# 2 Complaint)(RJL) Modified on 3/29/2007 (Riemer, Rena). QC'd jam

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timebase Pty Ltd v. Thomson Corporation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timebase Pty Ltd
Represented By: Joseph N Hosteny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Corporation, The
Represented By: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Publishing Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Services Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?