Rozman v. Menu Foods Midwest Corporation et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Stephanie Rozman
Defendant: ChemNutra, Inc., Nutro Products, Inc., Menu Foods Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., PETsMART, Inc., John Does 1 through 100, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Limited and Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
Case Number: 0:2007cv01808
Filed: April 9, 2007
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Referring Judge: Arthur J. Boylan
Presiding Judge: Ann D. Montgomery
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2007 NOTICE to Attorney: Copy of Complaint, Transfer Order and Docket Sheet sent via e-mail to the District of New Jersey. (kt)
September 20, 2007 26 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1), transferring case to the District of New Jersey per MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Noel L Hillman. (kt) QC'd by JME
August 17, 2007 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Stephanie Rozman. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
July 3, 2007 24 Featured Case ORDER granting extension to answer or otherwise plead until 8/31/07 or 14 days after the District of New Jersey accepts transfer of this action, whichever is earlier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 7/3/07. (kt)
July 2, 2007 23 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension to Answer or Otherwise Plead for Defendants Nutro Products, Inc., ChemNutra, Inc., and PetSmart, Inc. by Menu Foods Limited, Nutro Products, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., PETsMART, Inc., Stephanie Rozman, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Krisann)
June 28, 2007 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PETsMART, Inc. re 21 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution (Simonson, James)
June 28, 2007 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for PETsMART, Inc. (Simonson, James)
June 14, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 18 , 19 , 20 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorneys Noah Golden-Krasner, Frank Jablonski and Ilan J Chorowsky for Stephanie Rozman. Fees paid; receipt number 3-002863.Approved by Clerk Richard D Sletten on 6/14/07. (MMC)
June 14, 2007 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Ilan Chorowsky by Stephanie Rozman. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
June 14, 2007 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Frank Jablonski by Stephanie Rozman. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
June 14, 2007 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Noah Golden-Krasner by Stephanie Rozman. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
June 4, 2007 17 Featured Case ORDER: EXTENSION TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD FOR DEFENDANTS NUTRO PRODUCTS,INC., CHEMNUTRA, INC., AND PETSMART, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 6/4/07. (jam)
June 1, 2007 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nutro Products, Inc., PETsMART, Inc. re 15 Stipulation (Lee, Krisann)
June 1, 2007 15 STIPULATION (Joint) for Extension to Answer or Otherwise Plead for Defendants Nutro Products, Inc., ChemNutra, Inc. and PetSmart, Inc. by Nutro Products, Inc., PETsMART, Inc.. (Lee, Krisann)
May 17, 2007 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nutro Products, Inc., PETsMART, Inc. of SSSI, LLC and T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. as corporate parent and/or publicly held company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Krisann)
May 8, 2007 13 Featured Case ORDER re 11 Stipulation filed by ChemNutra, Inc., Defendant ChemNutra Inc. is hereby granted a 30-day extension to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 5/7/07. (jam)
May 7, 2007 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ChemNutra, Inc. re 11 Stipulation, 10 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 9 Notice of Appearance, 8 Notice of Appearance (Behrendt, Louise)
May 7, 2007 11 STIPULATION re 2 Amended Complaint, Joint Stipulation for Extension to Answer for Defendant ChemNutra Inc. by ChemNutra, Inc.. (Behrendt, Louise)
May 7, 2007 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ChemNutra, Inc. that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (Behrendt, Louise)
May 7, 2007 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S Kreidler on behalf of ChemNutra, Inc. (Kreidler, Michael)
May 7, 2007 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Louise A Behrendt on behalf of ChemNutra, Inc. (Behrendt, Louise)
May 3, 2007 7 Featured Case ORDER that 0:07-cv-2108 is reassigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery as a related case. Signed by Judges Ann D. Montgomery and Richard H. Kyle on 05/1/07. (JGG)
May 1, 2007 6 EXTENSION TO ANSWER for Defendants Nutro Products, Inc. and PetSmart, Inc. re 5 Stipulation . Defendants Nutro Products, Inc. and PetSmart, Inc., arehereby granted a 30-day extension to answer the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 5/1/2007. (kt)
April 30, 2007 5 STIPULATION re 2 Amended Complaint, Joint Stipulation for Extension to Answer for Defendants Nutro Products, Inc. and PetSmart, Inc. by Nutro Products, Inc., PETsMART, Inc., Stephanie Rozman. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Krisann)
April 27, 2007 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Krisann Kleibacker C Lee on behalf of Nutro Products, Inc., PETsMART, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Krisann)
April 27, 2007 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack M Fribley on behalf of Nutro Products, Inc., PETsMART, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fribley, Jack)
April 10, 2007 Amended Summons Issued as to Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Nutro Products, Inc., ChemNutra, Inc., John Does 1 through 100, PETsMART, Inc., Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods Income Fund. (JME)
April 9, 2007 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PETsMART, Inc., Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Nutro Products, Inc., ChemNutra, Inc., John Does 1 through 100, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods Income Fund, filed by Stephanie Rozman.(Blanchfield, Garrett)
April 9, 2007 Summons Issued as to Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Nutro Products, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., ChemNutra, Inc., John Does 1 through 100, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods Income Fund. (kt)
April 9, 2007 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 3002433.) assigned to Judge Ann D Montgomery per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur J Boylan, filed by Stephanie Rozman. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rozman v. Menu Foods Midwest Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Rozman
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChemNutra, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S Kreidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutro Products, Inc.
Represented By: Jack M Fribley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETsMART, Inc.
Represented By: Mark-NA C. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?