Imation Corporation v. Koninkluke Philips Electronics N.V. et al
Plaintiff: Imation Corporation
Defendant: U.S. Philips Corporation, Philips Electronics North America Corporation and Koninkluke Philips Electronics N.V.
Case Number: 0:2007cv03668
Filed: August 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Susan R. Nelson
Presiding Judge: Donovan W. Frank
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 552 CONSENT JUDGMENT. 1. With respect to this action, the Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter and the Parties. 2. All claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims asserted in this litigation are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, subject to the terms of the confidential Settlement Agreement. See Order for details. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/12/2010. (BJS)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 480 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 415 Motion to Stay; granting 450 Motion for Leave to File (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 6/22/09. (GMO)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER denying 210 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/11/09. (GMO)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 215 Motion for Summary Judgment (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/28/09. (GMO)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 297 MEMORANDUM OPINION(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/2/09. (GMO)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting 223 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); granting 227 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 1/21/09. (GMO)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting 122 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Counts Three and Four of the Complaint are dismissed; Judgment is entered in favor of Philips on the First Cause of Action of the Amended Answer to Complaint, counterclaims and Third-Party Complaint (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 11/26/2008. (rlb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Imation Corporation v. Koninkluke Philips Electronics N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Philips Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Electronics North America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koninkluke Philips Electronics N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imation Corporation
Represented By: Allen A Slaughter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?