McKenzie v. Fabian et al
Plaintiff: Mwati P McKenzie
Defendant: Joan Fabian, Lynn Dingle and Mary McComb
Case Number: 0:2007cv04441
Filed: November 1, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Paul A. Magnuson
Presiding Judge: Janie S. Mayeron
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order Adopting Magistrate Judge's Reports and Recommendations 42 60 ; Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss 34 ; Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 19 ; Denying as moot Defendants' Second Motion to Extend Trial Date 57 ; and Dismissing With Prejudice the Complaint 1 . LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 09/11/2009. (LM)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lynn Dingle, Mary McComb, Joan Fabian granted. Objections to R&R due by 8/31/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 8/12/09. (VEM)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 1. Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Complaint [Docket No. 34] be DENIED. 2. Plaintiff shall serve on defendants and file with the Court his response to defendants' summary judgment motion on or before July 3, 2009. Objections to R&R due by 6/26/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 6/9/09. (VEM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenzie v. Fabian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mwati P McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Dingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary McComb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?