TimeBase Pty Ltd. v. Thomson Corporation, The et al Featured Case

Plaintiff TimeBase Pty Ltd. alleged that Defendants The Thomson Corporation, West Publishing Corporation, and West Services, Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 7,293,228 entitled "MALTweb Multi-Axis Viewing Interface and Higher Level Scoping."

Plaintiff: TimeBase Pty Ltd.
Defendant: Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation and West Services, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2007cv04551
Filed: November 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Arthur J. Boylan
Presiding Judge: Ann D. Montgomery
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2009 Filing 51 DOCUMENT REMOVED PER CHAMBERS, FILED IN INCORRECT CASE. TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 6/28/07 before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (37 pages). Court Reporter: Leslie Pingley (E-mail: lesliepingley@yahoo.com. Telephone: 651-681-8550). Redaction Request due 9/21/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (RLR) (Main Document 51 replaced on 12/1/2009) (Ellingson, Jackie). Modified on 12/1/2009 (JME).
August 31, 2009 Filing 50 DOCUMENT REMOVED, FILED IN INCORRECT CASE. NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (RLR) (Main Document 50 replaced on 12/1/2009) (JME)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that all filings and proceedings in these matters shall proceed solely with Civil No. 07-1687 (JNE/JJG) as the caption, and Civil No. 07-4551 (JNE/JJG), the consolidated case, shall no longer be listed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 6/4/09. (RLR)
May 21, 2009 Filing 48 STIPULATION re 46 Order Staying Case, by all parties. (Cunningham, Michael) Modified filers and text on 5/22/2009 (akl).
February 25, 2009 Filing 47 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR STATUS REPORT REGARDING REEXAMINATIONS by TimeBase Pty Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 AFFIDAVIT OF ARTHUR A. GASEY)(Gasey, Arthur) Modified text on 2/26/2009 (jz).
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER STAYING CASE. IT IS ORDERED THAT:1.Civil No. 07-1687 and Civil No. 07-4551 are CONSOLIDATED.2.Civil No. 07-1687 and Civil No. 07-4551 are STAYED pending the reexamination of the 592 Patent.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on May 6, 2008. (slf)
April 25, 2008 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services, Inc. re 43 Brief, 44 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate (Gordon, Shawn)
April 25, 2008 Filing 44 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services, Inc. re 43 Brief,. (Gordon, Shawn)
April 25, 2008 Filing 43 BRIEF (Supplemental) Addressing Issues Related to the Reconsideration of the Orders Denying a Stay of the '228 Case (NO. 07-4551) and Lifting the Stay of the '592 Case (No. 07-1687). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Gordon, Shawn) Modified text on 4/28/2008 (akl).
April 25, 2008 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TimeBase Pty Ltd. re 40 Brief, 41 Declaration. (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified links and text on 4/28/2008 (akl).
April 25, 2008 Filing 41 Third DECLARATION by TimeBase Pty Ltd. Of Joseph N. Hosteny. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5-1, # 6 Exhibit 5-2, # 7 Exhibit 5-3, # 8 Exhibit 5-4, # 9 Exhibit 5-5, # 10 Exhibit 5-6, # 11 Exhibit 5-7, # 12 Exhibit 5-8, # 13 Exhibit 5-9, # 14 Exhibit 5-10, # 15 Exhibit 5-11, # 16 Exhibit 5-12, # 17 Exhibit 5-13, # 18 Exhibit 5-14, # 19 Exhibit 5-15, # 20 Exhibit 5-16, # 21 Exhibit 5-17, # 22 Exhibit 5-18, # 23 Exhibit 5-19, # 24 Exhibit 5-20, # 25 Exhibit 5-21, # 26 Exhibit 5-22, # 27 Exhibit 5-23, # 28 Exhibit 5-24, # 29 Exhibit 5-25, # 30 Exhibit 5-26, # 31 Exhibit 5-27, # 32 Exhibit 5-28, # 33 Exhibit 5-29, # 34 Exhibit 5-30, # 35 Exhibit 5-31, # 36 Exhibit 5-32, # 37 Exhibit 5-33, # 38 Exhibit 5-34, # 39 Exhibit 5-35, # 40 Exhibit 5-36, # 41 Exhibit 5-37, # 42 Exhibit 5-38, # 43 Exhibit 5-39, # 44 Exhibit 5-40, # 45 Exhibit 5-41, # 46 Exhibit 5-42, # 47 Exhibit 5-43, # 48 Exhibit 5-44, # 49 Exhibit 5-45, # 50 Exhibit 5-46, # 51 Exhibit 5-47, # 52 Exhibit 5-48)(Hosteny, Joseph)
April 25, 2008 Filing 40 BRIEF (Supplemental) Regarding Appeal of and Objections to Orders Denying a Stay of the '228 Case (No.07-4551) and Lifting the Stay of the '592 Case (No. 07-1687) filed by TimeBase Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hosteny, Joseph)
April 24, 2008 Filing 39 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services, Inc. of Thomson Reuters Corporation and Thomson Reuters PLC as corporate parent and/or publicly held company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gordon, Shawn)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re 37 Letter to District Judge filed by TimeBase Pty Ltd., 35 Letter to District Judge filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on April 18, 2008. (slf)
April 17, 2008 Filing 37 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by TimeBase Pty Ltd.. (Hosteny, Joseph)
April 3, 2008 Filing 36 CANCELLATION OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE The Pretrial Conference scheduled for Friday, April 11, 2008 has been cancelled. The conference will be rescheduled after the ruling on defendants' appeal of this Court's order lifting the stayin Case No. 07-CV-1687 (JNE/JJG) and consolidating these cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 4/3/08. (JMH)
April 1, 2008 Filing 35 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 3/28/08 Office Action)(Gordon, Shawn)
March 11, 2008 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TimeBase Pty Ltd. re 33 Declaration in Support, 32 Response, (Hosteny, Joseph)
March 11, 2008 Filing 33 Second Declaration of Joseph N. Hosteny in Support of 32 Response, filed by TimeBase Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4(A), # 5 Exhibit 4(B))(Hosteny, Joseph)
March 11, 2008 Filing 32 RESPONSE re 28 Memorandum, Filed by Defendants In Support of Their Appeal Of And Objections To Orders Denying A Stay Of The '228 Case (07-4551) And Lifting The Stay Of The '592 Case (07-1687), filed by TimeBase Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Rule 7.1 Certificate of Compliance)(Hosteny, Joseph)
March 5, 2008 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ( Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2008 10:30 AM, in Room 750, 180 East 5th Street, St. Paul, before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 3/5/08. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(RJL)
February 27, 2008 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mary V Sooter for Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation and West Services, Inc. Fee paid; receipt number 3-003913. Approved by Clerk Richard D Sletten on 2/27/08. (MMC)
February 26, 2008 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The re 29 Declaration in Support, 28 Memorandum, 27 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 24 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases (Gordon, Shawn)
February 26, 2008 Filing 29 Declaration of Shawn T. Gordon in Support of 27 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 24 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Thomson Corporation, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4)(Gordon, Shawn)
February 26, 2008 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by Thomson Corporation, The re 27 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 24 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Thomson Corporation, The. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gordon, Shawn)
February 26, 2008 Filing 27 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 24 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases (Gordon, Shawn)
February 26, 2008 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services, Inc. re 25 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mary V. Sooter (Gordon, Shawn)
February 26, 2008 Filing 25 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mary V. Sooter by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services, Inc.. (Gordon, Shawn)
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Consolidate Cases with 07-1687.Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 2/7/08. (RJL)
February 8, 2008 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on January 24, 2008 before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J Graham. Court Reporter: Leslie Pingley. (18pgs) FILED CONVENTIONALLY (jdf)
January 24, 2008 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham : Motion Hearing held on 1/24/2008 re 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services, Inc. Motion taken under advisment, and an order will be issued. (Tape #JJG Civil No. 21) (RJL)
January 18, 2008 Filing 21 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF TIME OF HEARING ON MOTION 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases : Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2008 09:30 AM in Minneapolis - Courtroom 8E before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (RJL)
January 18, 2008 Filing 20 Corrected DECLARATION re 17 Response,,, by TimeBase Pty Ltd. (Muldoon Dec., Attaching Exhibits A and B). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Hosteny, Joseph)
January 17, 2008 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TimeBase Pty Ltd. re 17 Response, 18 LR 7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate (Hosteny, Joseph) Modified links and text on 1/18/2008 (akl).
January 17, 2008 Filing 18 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by TimeBase Pty Ltd. re 17 Response,,,. (Hosteny, Joseph)
January 17, 2008 Filing 17 RESPONSE re 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by TimeBase Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Muldoon Dec.# 2 Hosteny Dec.# 3 Exh 1 to Hosteny Dec.# 4 Exh 2 to Hosteny Dec.# 5 Exh 3 to Hosteny Dec.# 6 Exh 4 to Hosteny Dec.# 7 Exh 5 to Hosteny Dec.# 8 Exh 6 to Hosteny Dec.# 9 Exh 7A to Hosteny Dec.# 10 Exh 7B to Hosteny Dec.# 11 Exh 8A to Hosteny Dec.# 12 Exh 8B to Hosteny Dec.# 13 Exh 8C to Hosteny Dec.# 14 Exh 8D to Hosteny Dec.# 15 Exh 8E to Hosteny Dec.# 16 Exh 9 to Hosteny Dec.# 17 Exh 10 to Hosteny Dec.# 18 Exh 11 to Hosteny Dec.# 19 Exh 12A to Hosteny Dec.# 20 Exh 12B to Hosteny Dec.# 21 Exh 13 to Hosteny Dec.# 22 Exh 14 to Hosteny Dec.# 23 Exh 15 to Hosteny Dec.# 24 Exh 16A to Hosteny Dec.# 25 Exh 16B to Hosteny Dec.)(Hosteny, Joseph)
January 11, 2008 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Arthur A Gasey for TimeBase Pty Ltd. Fee paid; receipt number 4-018871. Approved by Clerk Richard D Sletten on 1/11/08. (MMC)
January 10, 2008 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The re 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 13 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 15 Declaration in Support, 14 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Gordon, Shawn)
January 10, 2008 Filing 15 Declaration of Shawn T. Gordon in Support of 14 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Thomson Corporation, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1# 2 Exhibit(s) 2# 3 Exhibit(s) 3, Part I# 4 Exhibit(s) 3, Part II# 5 Exhibit(s) 4# 6 Exhibit(s) 5# 7 Exhibit(s) 6# 8 Exhibit(s) 7# 9 Exhibit(s) 8# 10 Exhibit(s) 9, Part I# 11 Exhibit(s) 9, Part II# 12 Exhibit(s) 9, Part III# 13 Exhibit(s) 10# 14 Exhibit(s) 11# 15 Exhibit(s) 12)(Gordon, Shawn)
January 10, 2008 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gordon, Shawn)
January 10, 2008 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases : Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2008 09:00 AM in Minneapolis - Courtroom 8E before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Gordon, Shawn)
January 10, 2008 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services, Inc.. (Gordon, Shawn)
January 9, 2008 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Arthur A. Gasey by TimeBase Pty Ltd.. (Cunningham, Michael)
January 8, 2008 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services, Inc. re 9 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Gordon, Shawn)
January 8, 2008 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services, Inc. that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (Gordon, Shawn)
November 29, 2007 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Wagner, Kevin)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen and Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham for all further proceedings. Judge Ann D. Montgomery, Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan no longer assigned to case. The new case number is 07cv4551 JNE/JJG. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 11/27/07 and Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/28/07. (JME)
November 21, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph N Hosteny for TimeBase Pty Ltd. Fee paid; receipt number 4-017827. Approved by Clerk Richard D Sletten on 11/21/07. (MMC)
November 19, 2007 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Joseph N. Hosteny by TimeBase Pty Ltd.. (Cunningham, Michael)
November 15, 2007 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TimeBase Pty Ltd.. West Services, Inc. served on 11/9/2007, answer due 11/29/2007. (Cunningham, Michael)
November 15, 2007 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TimeBase Pty Ltd.. West Publishing Corporation served on 11/9/2007, answer due 11/29/2007. (Cunningham, Michael)
November 15, 2007 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TimeBase Pty Ltd.. Thomson Corporation, The served on 11/13/2007, answer due 12/3/2007. (Cunningham, Michael)
November 7, 2007 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TimeBase Pty Ltd. that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (kt) QC'd by KT on 11/8/07.
November 7, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomson Corporation, The, West Publishing Corporation, West Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 40017484.) assigned to Judge Ann D Montgomery per Patent List and referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur J Boylan, filed by TimeBase Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kt) QC'd by KT on 11/8/07.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TimeBase Pty Ltd. v. Thomson Corporation, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TimeBase Pty Ltd.
Represented By: Joseph N Hosteny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Corporation, The
Represented By: Kevin P Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Publishing Corporation
Represented By: Kevin P Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?