Halverson v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Sharon Halverson
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 0:2008cv00784
Filed: March 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Carlton
Presiding Judge: Ericksen
Presiding Judge: Nelson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 45 and denying 40 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Sharon Halverson (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on July 28, 2009. (slf)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: that Plaintiff's Petition for Approval of an Attorney's Fee Under the Social Security Act Doc. No. 40 be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 7/28/2009 Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 07/13/2009. (MMP)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 31 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Sharon Halverson be granted. Objections to R&R due by 7/27/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 7/10/09. (kt)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 23 for 19 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael J Astrue, 12 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sharon Halverson. This case is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with the Report and Recommendation (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on January 26, 2009. (slf)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: 1. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Doc. No. 12 be DENIED as to reversal but GRANTED as to remand; 2. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Doc. No. 19 be DENIED; and 3. This case be remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with this Report and Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 1/20/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 01/05/2009. (MMP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halverson v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Halverson
Represented By: Lionel H Peabody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Represented By: Lonnie F Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?