Marquette Business Credit, Inc v. International Wook, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Marquette Business Credit, Inc
Defendant: Irwin A Engelman, International Wook, Inc, Sonak Management LLC and Edward G Gleason
Case Number: 0:2008cv01383
Filed: May 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Ericksen
Presiding Judge: Nelson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER denying 98 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED THAT:1.Marquettes Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [Docket No. 98] is DENIED as to Counts III, IV, and V.2.Counsel shall inform the undersigneds Calendar Clerk, Sheri Frette, on or before Wednesday, March 10, 2010, whether they wish to avail themselves of the May 3, 2010, trial date. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on March 3, 2010. (slf)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting summary judgment in part and ordering a settlement conference(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on October 29, 2009. (slf)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying 68 Motion ; denying 71 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on March 27, 2009. (slf)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying letter request 73 (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on November 26, 2008. (slf)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re 57 Letter to District Judge, filed by Edward G Gleason, International Wood, Inc., Sonak Management LLC. IT IS ORDERED THAT:1.Marquette shall establish the citizenship of International Wood, Sonak, Gleason, and Engelman by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, November 10, 2008.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on November 6, 2008. (slf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquette Business Credit, Inc v. International Wook, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irwin A Engelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Wook, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonak Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward G Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquette Business Credit, Inc
Represented By: John R McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?