Bernstein v. Extendicare Health Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Laura Bernstein
Defendant: Extendicare Homes, Inc. and Extendicare Health Services, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2008cv05874
Filed: October 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Frank
Presiding Judge: Mayeron
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Attorney Fees (Written Opinion). LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 6/24/09. (GMO)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM denying 48 Motion for Reconsideration (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 6/11/09. (GMO)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM denying 45 First MOTION to Continue Motion for Continuance of Defendants' Motion For Costs and Attorneys' Fees Pending Outcome of Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 4/21/09. (GMO) Modified link & text on 4/24/2009 (lph).
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/4/09. (GMO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernstein v. Extendicare Health Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extendicare Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extendicare Health Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Bernstein
Represented By: Kevin - NA Coluccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?