Klinkhammer v. Anishinabe Legal Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Klinkhammer
Defendant: Northwest Minnesota Foundation, The and Anishinabe Legal Services, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2008cv06320
Filed: December 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Beltrami
Presiding Judge: Ericksen
Presiding Judge: Erickson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT:1.NMFs Motion for Summary Judgment [Docket No. 38] is GRANTED.2.Anishinabes Motion for Summary Judgment [Docket No. 51] is GRANTED. 3.Defendants Joint Motion to Strike Affidavit [Docket No. 62] is DENIED.4.Counsel for Klinkh ammer shall not charge or collect any fees from Klinkhammer incurred in the preparation or filing of Silks affidavit or show-cause memorandum.5.This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on April 5, 2010. (slf)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 20 and denying 8 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Michael Klinkhammer (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on July 10, 2009. (slf)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION That the Plaintiff's Motion for Remand Docket No. 8 be denied. Objections to R&R due by 6/1/2009. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Raymond L. Erickson on 05/13/09. (jz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klinkhammer v. Anishinabe Legal Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Minnesota Foundation, The
Represented By: V John Ella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anishinabe Legal Services, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J Nickitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Klinkhammer
Represented By: Michael R Ruffenach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?