Ukofia v. Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Ukofia
Defendant: Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kenneth Olson, Sherburne County Jail Clinic and Cari NLN
Case Number: 0:2009cv00017
Filed: January 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Sherburne
Presiding Judge: Graham
Presiding Judge: Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Court OVERRULES plaintiff's objection [Docket No. 96 ] and ADOPTS the R&R [Docket No. 93 ]. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The motion of defendants Kenneth Olson and Five Other Unknown Deportation Officers of the Bureau of Immigration & Customs Enforcement for summary judgment [Docket No. 78 ] is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiff's excessive-force claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 3. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a third amended complaint [Docket No. 91 ] is DENIED. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 3/29/11. (sf)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 43 Report and Recommendation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Sherburne County Jail, Sherburne County Jail Clinic, Rachel Cannings, Cari Bancroft, and Dr. Leonard (Doc. No. 11 ) is GRANTED, and all claims against these Defendants are DISMISSED; 2. The Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Bureau of Immigration Appeals, Terry Louie, Amy Zask e, Jared Drengson, Scott Baniecke, Kenneth Olson, and Five Unknown Agents (Doc. No. 30 ) are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as follows: a. All claims against the Department of Homeland Security, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, B ureau of Immigration Appeals, Terry Louie, Amy Zaske, Jared Drengson, and Scott Baniecke are DISMISSED; b. All claims, except the Bivens excessive force claim, against Kenneth Olson and the Five Unknown Agents are DISMISSED; and 3. The Motion for Extension of Time to Plead and Renewed Request for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. No. 40 ) is GRANTED as to the extension but is DENIED as to appointment of counsel. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 2/17/10. (sf)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 1. The Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Sherburne County Jail, Sherburne County Jail Clinic, Rachel Cannings, Cari Bancroft, and Dr. Leonard 11 be GRANTED, and all claims against these Defendants be DISMISSED; 2. The Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Bureau of Immigration Appeals, Terry Louie, Amy Zaske, Jared Drengson, Scott Baniecke, Kenneth Olson, and Five Unknown Agents 30 be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as follows:a. All claims against the Department of Homeland Security, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Bureau of Immigration Appeals, Terry Louie, Amy Zaske, Jared Drengson, and Scott Baniecke be DISMISSED; b. All claims, except the Bivens excessive force claim, against Kenneth Olson and the Five Unknown Agents be DISMISSED; and 3. The Motion for Extension of Time to Plead and Renewed Request for Appointment of Counsel 40 be GRANTED as to the extension butDENIED as to appointment of counsel. Objections to R&R due by 2/2/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 1/19/10. (VEM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ukofia v. Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ukofia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherburne County Jail Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cari NLN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?