Continental Casualty Company v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Plaintiff: Continental Casualty Company
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Case Number: 0:2009cv00287
Filed: February 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Graham
Presiding Judge: Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Continental's request for contribution from National Union in an amount of $80,520.77 plus interest recoverable thereon in an amount to be determined is GRANTED.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on September 12, 2014. (DML)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 260 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (1) Granting in part and denying in part Valspar's 184 Motion for Summary Judgment. (a) Motion granted to the extent i t seeks a declaration that Valspar does not have a duty to c ontribute to defense costs Continental incurred in defending Valspar in the four underlying lawsuits. (b) Motion denied to the extent it seeks a decla ration that National Union does not have a duty to defend under the Program years. (c) Motion denie d to the extent it seeks a declaration that National Union does not owe a duty to contribute to defense costs Continental incurred in defending Valspar in the four underlying lawsuits. (2) Granting in part and denying in part Continental Casualty 9;s 191 Motion for Summary Judgment. (a) Motion granted to the extent it seeks a declaration that National Union has a duty to defend Valspar during the Program years. (b) Motion granted to the extent it seeks a declaration that National Union has a duty to contribute to Continental for costs Continental incurred in defending Valspar in the four underlying actions. (c) Motion denied to the extent it seeks a declaration that Valspar has a duty to contr ibute to defense costs Continental incurred in defending Valspar in the four underlying lawsuits. (3) Denying National Union's 205 request for judgment independent of a motion. (This order amends its March 29, 2013 220 order by correcting the characterization of International as a primary insurer in the Memorandum Opinion of the order on pages 22 and 54 and footnote 46. In all other respects, the March 29, 2013, order is unchanged.) (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on August 9, 2013. (DML)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (1) Granting in part and denying in part Valspar's 184 Motion for Summary Judgment. (a) Motion granted to the extent i t seeks a declaration that Valspar does not have a duty to contribute to defense costs Continental incurred in defending Valspar in the four underlying lawsuits. (b) Motion denied to the extent it seeks a decla ration that National Union does not have a duty to defend under the Program years. (c) Motion denied to the extent it seeks a declaration that National Union does not owe a duty to contribute to defense costs C ontinental incurred in defending Valspar in the four underlying lawsuits. (2) Granting in part and denying in part Continental Casualty's 191 Motion for Summary Judgment. (a) Motion granted to the extent it seeks a declaration that National Union has a duty to defend Valspar during the Program years. (b) Motion granted to the extent it seeks a declaration that National Union has a duty to contribute to Continental for costs Continental incurred in defending Valspar in the four underlying actions. (c) Motion denied to the extent it seeks a declaration that Valspar has a duty to contr ibute to defense costs Continental incurred in defending Valspar in the four underlying lawsuits. (3) Denying National Union's 205 request for judgment independent of a motion (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on March 29, 2013. (DML)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER: The parties may each file a letter brief, not to exceed 2,500 words, by July 15, 2010, regarding the recent Minnesota Supreme Court decision in Cargill, Inc. v. Ace American Ins. Co., et al. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on July 8, 2010. (HAM)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re 51 Stipulation filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. All responsive briefs to Continental's Motion shall be filed on or before January 11, 2010, and that replies to responsive briefs be filed on or before January 25, 2010. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on November 9, 2009. (HAM)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re 44 Stipulation filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Responsive briefs to Continentals Motion shall be filed on or before November 10, 2009, and that replies to responsive briefs be filed on or before November 24, 2009.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on October 14, 2009. (HAM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Casualty Company v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Karen H Ventrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Dale O Thornsjo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?