Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Hibbing Taconite Company
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Hibbing Taconite Company
Case Number: 0:2009cv00729
Filed: March 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: St. Louis
Presiding Judge: Erickson
Presiding Judge: Kyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER sustaining in part and overruling in part the Objections 257 and 258 to 275 Hibbing's Amended Bill of Costs and ORDERING that the Clerk of Court tax $24,148.83 in costs against the EEOC. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 10/21/10. (kll)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER denying 267 Motion for Attorney Fees, Expenses and Non-Taxable Costs. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 09/21/10. (kll)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER FOR JUDGMENT; DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE 23 Intervenor Complaint and 1 Complaint. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 08/02/10. (kll)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER setting Motions hearing and final pre-trial conference. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 07/16/10. (kll)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER denying as moot 66 Motion to Exclude; denying jury site visit; denying as moot request for additional trial days re: 123 Motion. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 07/01/10. (kll)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 and 73 Motions for Summary Judgment; deferring 66 Motion to Exclude. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 06/02/10. (kll)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER-Notice of Trial and Schedule for Submission of Trial Materials. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 05/20/10. (kll)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that all proceedings before the undersigned (motions, trial, etc.) will be held in the U.S. Courthouse in Duluth, Minnesota. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 04/01/09. (rhks)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Hibbing Taconite Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hibbing Taconite Company
Represented By: R Thomas Torgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Jean P Kamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?