D&G, Inc. v. Supervalu, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: D&G, Inc. and Robert Warren Wentworth Jr., Inc.
Defendant: Supervalu, Inc. and C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2009cv00983
Filed: April 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boylan
Presiding Judge: Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the August 3, 2017 Omnibus Case Management & Fourth Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order 838 is AFFIRMED; Defendant SuperValu, Inc.'s Objections 845 are OVERRULED (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 08/29/2017. Associated Cases: 0:09-md-02090-ADM-TNL, 0:09-cv-00983-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-02932-ADM-TNL, 0:09-cv-03191-ADM-TNL, 0:14-cv-04031-ADM-TNL(TLU)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER in case 0:09-cv-00983-ADM-AJB; Overuling (526, 528, 529) APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge; the June 19, 2015 Order 524 is AFFIRMED in case 0:09-md-02090-ADM-TNL (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 08/20/2015. Associated Cases: 0:09-md-02090-ADM-TNL et al.(TLU)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying [113 in 0:09-md-02090-ADM-TNL] MOTION to Dismiss filed by C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc., Supervalu, Inc. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/16/2015. Associated Cases: 0:09-md-02090-ADM-TNL et al.(TLU)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER re (440 in 0:09-md-02090-ADM-AJB) Bill of Costs, filed by C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc., (439 in 0:09-md-02090-ADM-AJB) Bill of Costs filed by Supervalu, Inc. The Court will hold the issues of assessment of costs in abeyance pending further order of the Court (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/26/2013. Associated Cases: 0:09-md-02090-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-00983-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-02940-ADM-AJB(TLU)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER in case 0:09-cv-00983-ADM-AJB; granting (353) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (365) Plaintiffs' Motion to Defer Consideration; denying (375) Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 0:09-md-02090-ADM-AJB (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 01/11/2013. Associated Cases: 0:09-md-02090-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-00983-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-02940-ADM-AJB(TLU)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 REDACTED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER previously signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 7/16/2012. Associated Cases: 0:09-md-02090-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-00983-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-02940-ADM-AJB(GS)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER in case 0:09-cv-00983-ADM-AJB; granting (161) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 0:09-md-02090-ADM-AJB (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 08/30/2011. Associated Cases: 0:09-md-02090-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-00983-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-02940-ADM-AJB(TLU)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (102) Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part (108) Defendants' Motion to Compel in case 0:09-md-02090-ADM-AJB (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 04/06/2011. Associated Cases: 0:09-md-02090-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-00983-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-02940-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-03191-ADM-AJB(TLU)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER in case 0:09-cv-00983-ADM-AJB; granting (87) Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings in case 0:09-md-02090-ADM-AJB (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 02/08/2011. Associated Cases: 0:09-md-02090-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-00983-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-02940-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-03191-ADM-AJB(TLU)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER in case 0:09-cv-00983-ADM-AJB; denying (24) Motion to Dismiss; denying (28) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 0:09-md-02090-ADM-AJB (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 7/7/2010. Associated Cases: 0:09-md-02090-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-00983-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-02932-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-02940-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-03191-ADM-AJB(GS)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 PRELIMINARY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/15/2009. Associated Cases: 0:09-md-02090-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-00983-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-02932-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-02940-ADM-AJB, 0:09-cv-03191-ADM-AJB(TLU)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 21 Motion to Transfer to District of Minnesota. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/24/2009. (llj) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 4/27/2009.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D&G, Inc. v. Supervalu, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervalu, Inc.
Represented By: K Craig Wildfang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Represented By: Todd A Wind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D&G, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly H Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Warren Wentworth Jr., Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly H Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?