Automated Telemarketing Services, Inc. v. Aspect Software, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Automated Telemarketing Services, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Aspect Software, Inc. |
Counter Claimant: |
Aspect Software, Inc. |
Counter Defendant: |
Automated Telemarketing Services, Inc. |
Case Number: |
0:2009cv01308 |
Filed: |
June 3, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Minnesota |
Office: |
DMN Office |
County: |
Hennepin |
Presiding Judge: |
Frank |
Presiding Judge: |
Noel |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 18, 2011 |
Filing
156
ORDER as to Motions in Limine. See Order for details. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/18/2011. (BJS)
|
November 15, 2010 |
Filing
108
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. 1. Aspect's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 73 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: a. ATS's breach of contract claim, insofar as it is based on allegations that Aspect unjustifiably hinde red ATS's performance under or unreasonably failed to renew the SRA, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. b. ATS's breach of contract claim, insofar as it is based on the allegations that Aspect failed to give reasonable notice prior to terminating the SRA, remains viable. c. ATS's claim for breach of the covenant of good faith and fair dealing (Count Two) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. d. ATS's claim for tortious interference with contract is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. e. ATS's cl aim for tortious interference with customer relationships remains viable. 2. ATS's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 76 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: a. Aspect's fifth affirmative defense is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. b. ATS's motion is otherwise denied.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 11/15/2010. (BJS)
|
July 6, 2010 |
Filing
79
ORDER AFFIRMING 65 Magistrate Judge's Order. The Court reserves at this time ruling on Defendant's Motion for Sanctions pending resolution of the case for the reasons set forth in this Order. (Written Opinion.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 07/06/2010. (rlb)
|
August 10, 2009 |
Filing
20
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 5 Motion to Dismiss Count Three of the Complaint (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 8/10/09. (GMO)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?