Dryer et al v. National Football League Featured Case
Plaintiff: John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Joseph Michael Senser, Elvin Lamont Bethea, Dante Anthony Pastorini and Edward Alvin White
Defendant: National Football League
Case Number: 0:2009cv02182
Filed: August 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Magnuson
Presiding Judge: Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2010 Filing 54 Minute Entry: Status Conference proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 5/21/2010. The next status conference will be held on August 3, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. in Chambers Suite 9E before Magistrate Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (MMP)
April 26, 2010 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E Gustafson on behalf of Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gustafson, Daniel)
April 8, 2010 Filing 52 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 39 MOTION to Compel Response to First Request for Production of Documents : Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rudd, J) Modified text on 4/9/2010 (kt).
April 6, 2010 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White re 49 Reply to Response to Motion, 50 Affidavit in Support of Motion. (Rudd, J) Modified text on 4/7/2010 (jz).
April 6, 2010 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT of Brian C Gudmundson in SUPPORT OF 39 MOTION to Compel Response to First Request for Production of Documents filed by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 13-16)(Rudd, J)
April 6, 2010 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re 39 MOTION to Compel Response to First Request for Production of Documents filed by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Rudd, J)
March 31, 2010 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League re 47 Declaration in Support, 46 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Van Oort, Aaron)
March 31, 2010 Filing 47 Declaration of Daniel J. Connolly in Support of 46 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - 8)(Van Oort, Aaron)
March 31, 2010 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 39 MOTION to Compel Response to First Request for Production of Documents filed by National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Van Oort, Aaron)
March 15, 2010 Filing 45 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 39 MOTION to Compel Response to First Request for Production of Documents : Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rudd, J)
March 12, 2010 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White re 43 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 40 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 41 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 42 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 39 MOTION to Compel Response to First Request for Production of Documents. (Rudd, J) Modified text on 3/15/2010 (jz).
March 12, 2010 Filing 43 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White re 40 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Rudd, J)
March 12, 2010 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT of Brian C. Gudmundson in SUPPORT OF 39 MOTION to Compel Response to First Request for Production of Documents filed by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1-10, # 2 Placeholder for Exhibit 11, # 3 Exhibit(s) 12)(Rudd, J) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 3/12/10. (KT)
March 12, 2010 Filing 41 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 39 MOTION to Compel Response to First Request for Production of Documents : Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson. (Rudd, J)
March 12, 2010 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Support re 39 MOTION to Compel Response to First Request for Production of Documents filed by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Rudd, J)
March 12, 2010 Filing 39 MOTION to Compel Response to First Request for Production of Documents by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Rudd, J)
February 3, 2010 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence R King on behalf of Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(King, Lawrence)
February 3, 2010 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White re 36 Notice of Appearance. (Raiter, Shawn) Modified text on 2/4/2010 (jz).
February 3, 2010 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn M Raiter on behalf of Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Raiter, Shawn)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 13 Motion for Judgment on the pleadings. Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on January 26, 2010. (alt)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROTECTIVE ORDER: Upon Stipulation of the Parties for an Order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26{c) that trade secret or other confidential information be disclosed only in designated ways filed as Document Number 33 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 01/15/2010. (MMP)
January 15, 2010 Filing 33 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, National Football League, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Connolly, Daniel)
January 13, 2010 Filing 32 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 1/13/2010. Re: protective order. (MMP)
December 30, 2009 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 12/16/2009 before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (40 pages). Court Reporter: Ron Moen (E-mail: Ron_Moen@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1222). Redaction Request due 1/20/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/1/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/30/2010. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (RJM)
December 30, 2009 Filing 30 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (RJM)
December 16, 2009 ***TEXT ONLY***Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Magnuson: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2009 re 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by National Football League, argued, taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Ron Moen) (smr)
December 11, 2009 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J Becker on behalf of Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Becker, Timothy)
December 9, 2009 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League re 27 Declaration in Support, 26 Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Connolly, Daniel) Modified text on 12/10/2009 (jz).
December 9, 2009 Filing 27 Declaration of Aaron D. Van Oort in Support of 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Connolly, Daniel)
December 9, 2009 Filing 26 REPLY re 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Connolly, Daniel)
November 30, 2009 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White re 24 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 23 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Rudd, J) Modified text on 12/1/2009 (jz).
November 30, 2009 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of J. Gordon Rudd, Jr. in OPPOSITION TO 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Rudd, J) Modified text on 12/1/2009 (jz).
November 30, 2009 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Rudd, J)
November 13, 2009 Filing 22 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Connolly, Daniel)
November 12, 2009 Filing 21 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rudd, J)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 18 , 19 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys Bruce P. Keller and Mary Jo White for National Football League. Fees paid; receipt number 3-006443.Approved by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 11/2/09. (MMC)
October 30, 2009 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League re 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mary Jo White, 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Bruce P. Keller. (Connolly, Daniel) Modified text on 11/2/2009 (jz).
October 30, 2009 Filing 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mary Jo White by National Football League. (Connolly, Daniel)
October 30, 2009 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Bruce P. Keller by National Football League. (Connolly, Daniel)
October 30, 2009 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League re 16 Declaration in Support, 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, 14 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 15 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Connolly, Daniel) Modified text on 11/2/2009 (jz).
October 30, 2009 Filing 16 Declaration of Daniel J. Connolly in Support of 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Ex.1, # 2 Placeholder for Ex. 2, # 3 Placeholder for Ex. 3, # 4 Placeholder for Ex. 4, # 5 Placeholder for Ex. 5, # 6 Placeholder for Ex. 6, # 7 Placeholder for Ex. 7, # 8 Exhibit(s) 8, # 9 Exhibit(s) 9, # 10 Exhibit(s) 10, # 11 Exhibit(s) 11, # 12 Placeholder for Ex. 12, # 13 Placeholder for Ex. 13, # 14 Placeholder for Ex. 14, # 15 Placeholder for Ex. 15, # 16 Placeholder for Ex. 16, # 17 Placeholder for Ex. 17, # 18 Placeholder for Ex. 18, # 19 Placeholder for Ex. 19, # 20 Placeholder for Ex. 20, # 21 Placeholder for Ex. 21, # 22 Placeholder for Ex. 22, # 23 Placeholder for Ex. 23, # 24 Placeholder for Ex. 24, # 25 Placeholder for Ex. 25, # 26 Exhibit(s) 26)(Connolly, Daniel) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/30/09. (KT)
October 30, 2009 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Connolly, Daniel)
October 30, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Connolly, Daniel)
October 30, 2009 Filing 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by National Football League. (Connolly, Daniel)
October 30, 2009 Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Connolly, Daniel)
October 26, 2009 Filing 11 Pretrial Scheduling Order. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 10/22/2009. (LM)
October 20, 2009 ***TEXT ONLY***Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Magnuson: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference held on 10/20/2009. Order to be submitted. (smr)
October 14, 2009 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against National Football League, filed by James Lawrence Marshall, Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, Edward Alvin White, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser. (Stein, Robert)
October 13, 2009 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, National Football League, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Connolly, Daniel)
September 21, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE of Rule 16 Pretrial Conference set for October 20, 2009 @ 10:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 734 (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (smr)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 3 , 4 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys Daniel S. Ward and Thomas J. Ward for plaintiffs. Fees paid; receipt number 4-037661. Approved by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 9/14/09. (MMC)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD: Based on the parties' Stipulation, Docket No. 5 , it is hereby ordered that the time within which Defendant National Football League has to move against, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-entitled action is extended up to and including October 14, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 09/14/2009. (MMP)
September 11, 2009 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League re 5 Stipulation, (Connolly, Daniel)
September 11, 2009 Filing 5 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, National Football League, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Connolly, Daniel)
September 11, 2009 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Thomas J. Ward by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rudd, J)
September 11, 2009 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Daniel S. Ward by Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, James Lawrence Marshall, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser, Edward Alvin White. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rudd, J)
September 8, 2009 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lawrence Marshall, Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, Edward Alvin White, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser. National Football League served on 8/25/2009, answer due 9/14/2009. (Gudmundson, Brian)
August 20, 2009 Summons Issued as to National Football League. (MMP)
August 20, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Football League ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4037084.) assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Richard Nelson filed by James Lawrence Marshall, Elvin Lamont Bethea, John Frederick Dryer, Edward Alvin White, Dante Anthony Pastorini, Joseph Michael Senser. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dryer et al v. National Football League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Frederick Dryer
Represented By: Charles S Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lawrence Marshall
Represented By: Charles S Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Michael Senser
Represented By: Charles S Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvin Lamont Bethea
Represented By: Charles S Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante Anthony Pastorini
Represented By: Charles S Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Alvin White
Represented By: Charles S Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Represented By: Mary Jo White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?