Lawrence v. St. Paul, City of et al
Plaintiff: |
Kimberly Lawrence |
Defendant: |
Laura Bolduan, Sheila Hoff, Robert Jerue, Matthew Toupal, St. Paul, City of, St. Paul City Attorney's Office, Does and William Willner |
Case Number: |
0:2009cv02198 |
Filed: |
August 21, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Minnesota |
Office: |
DMN Office |
County: |
Hennepin |
Presiding Judge: |
Keyes |
Presiding Judge: |
Schiltz |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 15, 2010 |
Filing
43
ORDER - Based on the foregoing and on all of the files, records, and proceedings herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The motion of defendants City of St. Paul, Officer Laura Bolduan, Sergeant Sheila Hoff, Officer Robert Jerue, Sergeant Matthew Toupal, and the St. Paul City Attorney's Office to dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment 4 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: With respect to plaintiff's claims against defendants Officer Laura Bolduan and Officer R obert Jerue under 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 for retaliation against plaintiff Kimberly Lawrence for her protected First Amendment activity, the motion is DENIED. The motion is GRANTED in all other respects. The motion of defendant Officer William Will ner to dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment 8 is GRANTED. Accordingly: All of plaintiff's claims against defendants City of St. Paul, Sergeant Sheila Hoff, Sergeant Matthew Toupal, and the St. Paul City Attorney's Office are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND ON THE MERITS. With respect to defendants Officer Laura Bolduan and Officer Robert Jerue, all of plaintiff's claims except her First Amendment retaliation claim are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND ON THE MERITS. All of plaintiff's claims against defendant William Willner are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND ON THE MERITS. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 09/15/10. (bjs)
|
November 19, 2009 |
Filing
26
ORDER denying 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 11/19/09. Written Opinion. (bjs) Modified on 11/19/2009 (vem).
|
August 24, 2009 |
Filing
2
ORDER for Disqualification and for Reassignment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 08/24/09. (kll)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?