O'Brian v. Bank of America Home Loans, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Carson O'Brian
Defendant: John Doe, Mary Rowe and Bank of America Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2009cv02751
Filed: October 5, 2009
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Referring Judge: Boylan
Presiding Judge: Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 5 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. This action is summarily DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. 2. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Docket No. 2 ] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 11/9/09. (sf)
October 16, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 2 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carson O'Brian should be DENIED and 1 Complaint filed by Carson O'Brian should be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due by 10/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 10/15/09. (akl)
October 6, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Disqualification and for Reassignment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 10/06/09. (kll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brian v. Bank of America Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carson O'Brian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?