MCC Mortgage LP v. Office Depot, Inc.
Plaintiff: MCC Mortgage LP
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Office Depot, Inc.
Counter Defendant: MCC Mortgage LP
Case Number: 0:2010cv00191
Filed: January 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Keyes
Presiding Judge: Kyle
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 23:1441 Contract Real Estate

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER VACATING 38 Order, Dismissing this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 39 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 05/13/10. (kll)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING 4 MCC's Motion to Remand, REFERRING matter to Magistrate Judge Keyes for an expedited pretrial conference. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 02/12/10. (kll)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING hearing on City Centers Motion to Remand at 1:00 p.m. on Thursday, February 11, 2010; CANCELING the April 9, 2010 hearing; and setting briefing schedule for said Motion. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 02/02/10. (kll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCC Mortgage LP v. Office Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Andre T Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Office Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Ronn B Kreps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCC Mortgage LP
Represented By: Laura N Maupin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: MCC Mortgage LP
Represented By: Laura N Maupin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?