Corriveau v. Anoka, Minnesota, City of et al
Plaintiff: James G. Corriveau
Defendant: Anoka, Minnesota, City of and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2010cv03933
Filed: September 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Anoka
Presiding Judge: Franklin L. Noel
Presiding Judge: John R. Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER ADOPTING 115 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The above referenced action is dismissed (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/18/13. (LPH)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying plaintiff's 2 Motion for TRO (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on November 8, 2010. (DML)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that plaintiffs motion [Docket No.42] is DENIED. Parties will reconvene November 4, 2010 at 10:00 am.(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 11/01/10. (jam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corriveau v. Anoka, Minnesota, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James G. Corriveau
Represented By: Patrick John Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anoka, Minnesota, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?