Global Traffic Technologies, LLC v. Emtrac Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Global Traffic Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Emtrac Systems, Inc., Kristopher Morgan, Andrew Morgan and Rodney K. Morgan
Case Number: 0:2010cv04110
Filed: September 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Ramsey
Presiding Judge: Jeanne J. Graham
Presiding Judge: Ann D. Montgomery
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 09/09/2015. (TLU)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 540 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 532 Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Permit Registration of Judgement in Other Federal Courts. GTT is permitted to register this Court's Judgment against KME and Morgan in the Southern District of Illinois, the Northern District of California, and the Western District of Washington by filing a certified copy of the Judgment in those federal districts (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/09/2014. (TLU)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER denying [479, 494] Motions to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal; denying as moot 519 Motion in Limine (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 07/16/2014. (TLU)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 431 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 364 Plaintiff's Motion for Confirmation of Willful Infringement, Enhancement of Damages, and Prejudgment Interest; denying 369 Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matte r of Law; denying 369 Defendants' Motion for New Trial; denying 372 Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying Defendants' 375 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 375 Defendants' Motion for N ew Trial; denying 378 Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 378 Defendants' Motion for New Trial; denying 381 Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 381 Defendants' Motion for New Trial; denying 395 Defendants' Motion for Laches and Equitable Estoppel; denying 401 Defendants' Motion for an Amended ruling on Claim 16 Indefiniteness; denying 411 Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 04/25/2014. (TLU)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 328 Defendants' Motion to Deny Injunctive Relief; granting 333 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction; denying as moot 347 Defendants' Motion to Stay Execution of Money Judgment (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/08/2013. (TLU)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 123 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 126 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 132 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; denying 160 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 04/24/2013. (TLU)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER that in the '398 Patent the disputed terms will be construed in accordance with this Order (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 07/13/2012. (TLU)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Traffic Technologies, LLC v. Emtrac Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Traffic Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Timothy E Grimsrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emtrac Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristopher Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney K. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?